Adina Ringler v. Vida Shoes International Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John A Kronstadt |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02046 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:0227 Violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
Vida Shoes International Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adina Ringler
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 05/10 6:00 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Adina Ringler. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Edelsberg, Scott) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 04/14 1:46 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Vida Shoes International Inc. answer now due 5/15/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Vida Shoes International Inc..(Attorney D Jay Ritt added to party Vida Shoes International Inc.(pty:dft))(Ritt, D) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of D. Jay Ritt in Support of Stipulation, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/27 11:32 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Adina Ringler, upon Defendant Vida Shoes International Inc. served on 3/24/2023, answer due 4/14/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joelle Canaveral - Managing Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Edelsberg, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 3:59 PM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (pk) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 10:47 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Vida Shoes International Inc. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/22 10:43 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 10:43 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 10:43 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 7:48 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Adina Ringler, (Edelsberg, Scott) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 7:48 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Adina Ringler. (Edelsberg, Scott) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 7:47 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Adina Ringler. (Edelsberg, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 7:46 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34981427 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Adina Ringler. (Attorney Scott Edelsberg added to party Adina Ringler(pty:pla))(Edelsberg, Scott) |