Chima Alex Anyanwu v. Geico General Insurance Company et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02049 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles Superior Court, 22STCV35789 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Geico General Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Chima Alex Anyanwu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 05/09 2:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO DISMISS ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Good cause appearing, the Court GRANTS the joint stipulation and ORDERS as follows: 1. This action is DISMISSED in its entirety WITH PREJUDICE; and 2. The parties will bear their own costs and attorneys fees in connection with the dismissal. (aco) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 05/05 1:16 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant Geico General Insurance Company.(Bennett, Preston) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 04/17 10:56 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS ORDER MOVING CASE TO INACTIVE CALENDAR PENDING SETTLEMENT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court, having received the Notice of Settlement, filed April 14, 2023, vacates all previously set dates. The Court moves the matter to the inactive calendar pending finalization of settlement. The parties shall proceed with the settlement as outlined in the notice. Should the settlement not be finalized within the designated time, the parties shall notify the Court, in writing, and request that the matter be restored to the active calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (aco) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Settlement
Fri 04/14 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant Geico General Insurance Company. (Bennett, Preston) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Tue 04/04 2:07 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Defendant Geico General Insurance Company.. (Bennett, Preston) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 03/28 11:01 AM
IN CHAMBERS ORDER/TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: REQUEST to Continue Scheduling Conference from April 24, 2023 to May 1, 2023 filed by defendant Geico General Insurance Company9 - The request is DENIED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Continue
Mon 03/27 9:51 AM
REQUEST to Continue Scheduling Conference from April 24, 2023 to May 1, 2023 Re: Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only8 filed by defendant Geico General Insurance Company. Request set for hearing on 5/1/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (LeBeau, Jared) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 03/21 4:52 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/10/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (kmh) |
|
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 4:51 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (kmh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:26 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:26 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 2:25 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Geico General Insurance Company, identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc.. (Bennett, Preston) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 10:06 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Geico General Insurance Company. (Bennett, Preston) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 10:04 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 22STCV35789 Receipt No: ACACDC-34982714 - Fee: $402, filed by defendant Geico General Insurance Company. (Attorney Preston B Bennett added to party Geico General Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Bennett, Preston) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of P. Bennett, | ||
Att: 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, | ||
Att: 3 Superior Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 37 pgs Superior First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Superior Answer to FAC, | ||
Att: 6 Proof of Service | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 2:32 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Geico General Insurance Company. Jury Demanded, filed by Defendants Chima Alex Anyanwu. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |
||
othcmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/21 2:33 PM
NON-CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Geico General Insurance Company amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Chima Alex Anyanwu. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/21 2:35 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Geico General Insurance Company. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/17/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh) |