Attiya Awadallah v. Cerebral Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00493 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 18:2510 Wire Interception |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:00 AM PDT |
Defendant
Cerebral Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Attiya Awadallah
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/21/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Create Case Association ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Mon 04/17 12:31 PM
ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details.* (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 04/05 3:29 PM
ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: granting15 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph M Lyon MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Attiya Awadallah, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, designating Ferdeza Zekiri as local counsel. (bm) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Tue 04/04 5:43 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Attiya Awadallah (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35067626)15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Other error(s) with document(s): Document is an Application not a Noticed Motion. See form caption. (lt) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 04/04 4:01 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE: CONSOLIDATION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See Order for Details* (gga) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 04/03 12:19 PM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Attiya Awadallah (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35067626) filed by Plaintiff Attiya Awadallah. (Zekiri, Ferdeza) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PROPOSED) ORDER ON APPLICATION OF JOSEPH M. LYON TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 03/29 1:23 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Wed 03/22 3:24 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:23-cv-01803 FMO(MAAx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick and Judge Fred W. Slaughter to Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 8:23-cv-00493 FMO(MAAx). Signed by Judge Fernando M. Olguin (rn) |
|
12 | 12
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 9:05 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fred W. Slaughter. (mku) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Related Case(s)
Mon 03/20 5:01 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Attiya Awadallah. Related Case(s): 2:23-cv-01803, 2:23-cv-01828,2:23-cv-01901, 2:23-cv-01919, 2:23-cv-02021, 2:23-cv-02043 (Byrd, Rachele) |
|
10 | 10
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:19 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph M Lyon on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) |
|
9 | 9
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:17 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Philip J Krzeski on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 1:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Cerebral Inc. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:10 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:09 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fred W. Slaughter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 10:11 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Attiya Awadallah, (Byrd, Rachele) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 10:09 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Attiya Awadallah. (Byrd, Rachele) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 10:03 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Attiya Awadallah. (Byrd, Rachele) |
|
1 | 1
51
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 9:59 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34982732 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Attiya Awadallah. (Attorney Rachele R. Byrd added to party Attiya Awadallah(pty:pla))(Byrd, Rachele) |