Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company et al v. Jazmine Rosalea Herrera Ivoa
California Central District Court | |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02055 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 29, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 20, 2023 6:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jazmine Rosalea Herrera Ivoa
10125 San Vicente Avenue
South Gate, CA 90280 |
|
Defendant
Maria Herrera
|
|
Plaintiff
Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/29 10:28 AM
Notice NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Orloff, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Tue 03/28 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Miscellaneous Document,3 . The following error(s) was found: A case-initiating document was submitted without payment of the full filing fee. Within two business days of this notice, counsel must pay the filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis;otherwise, the docket for this case number will be closed and no further filings will be permitted under this case number. The filing fee may be paid online by docketing the event Pay Filing Fee. Other error(s) with document(s): The Complaint was e-filed under the wrong event. The correct event is located under Civil Events Initial Pleadings and Service Complaints and Other Initiating Documents. The filing fee should be paid when e-filing the complaint under the correct event. In addition the Certificate of Interested Parties and Summons should each be e-filed separately under the correct event. Civil Events Other Filings Notices for Certificate of Interested Parties. Civil Events Service Documents Service/Waivers of Summons and Complaints for the Summons Request. (car) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Fri 03/24 4:37 PM
Resubmission of Complaint, Cert of Interested Parties and Summons filed by Plaintiff Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company(Orloff, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Resubmission_Certificate of Interested Parties, | ||
Att: 2 Resubmission_Summons - Jasmine Herrera, | ||
Att: 3 Resubmission_Summons - Maria Herrera | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 03/24 4:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Allstate Northbrook Indemnity Company. (Orloff, Rebecca) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Fri 03/24 8:07 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: You have attempted to open this case electronically but have failed to upload successfully the required PDF version of any initiating document, such as a complaint or notice of removal. You must file an initiating document within two business days of this notice or the docket for this case number will be closed. The Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)is missing or incomplete. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule 3-1. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. cc: rebecca@pollakvida.com (car) |