Gerald Howard Unrot et al v. Nissan North America Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Hernan D Vera |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02057 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Nissan North America Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Mark Fingerman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gerald Howard Unrot
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Sunday, March 10, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Sun 03/10 5:18 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Based on the parties' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal33 , the entire action is hereby dismissed, with prejudice. JS-6 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm) |
|
35 | 35
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Sun 03/10 4:29 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY (In Chambers) ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: The Court has received and reviewed the parties' Notice of Settlement32 . Based on this submission, all hearing dates and deadlines are vacated, and the case is dismissed. The Court will retain jurisdiction for 60 days to reopen the case if the settlement is not finalized before then. [JS-6] THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (wm) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Fri 03/08 11:02 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-3.8 title page is missing, incomplete, or incorrect. Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Stipulation - Dismiss case. Other error(s) with document(s): Missing Judge's initials next to case no. [Prop] Order should have Judge Hernan D. Vera name next to signature line. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) |
|
33 | 33
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 03/08 9:03 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Larry Bailey, Gerald Howard Unrot. Dismissal is with prejudice.(Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/06 1:37 PM
Notice of Settlement Larry Bailey, Gerald Howard Unrot. Joint Notice (Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
order
Protective Order
Tue 10/10 9:59 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner re STIPULATION for Protective Order 30 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Protective Order
Fri 10/06 1:52 PM
Joint REQUEST for Protective Order filed by Defendant Nissan North America Inc..(Richardson, Jason) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/02 10:50 AM
ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, re Stipulation for Protective Order28 . The Court DECLINES to enter the proposed order. The parties may re-submit a correct version of their stipulation at their convenience with no adverse consequence. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Protective Order
Fri 09/29 4:32 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant Nissan North America Inc..(Richardson, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Tue 08/01 2:45 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for 11 02-2023 (Fingerman, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 07/26 1:44 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (cbr) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form
Thu 07/06 10:33 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Mark Fingerman has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 06/23 12:15 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Please refer to Order for complete details. (cbr) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Wed 06/21 9:50 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-068) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Hernan D. Vera, this case is transferred from Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong to the calendar of Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-02057-HDV-MRWx. (rn) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
18
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 06/06 11:58 AM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong,. The Scheduling Conference scheduled for JUNE 8, 2023, is hereby VACATED. The Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/5/2024 at 9:00 AM. The Jury Trial is set for 6/24/2024 at 8:30 AM. The last date to hear motion to Amended Pleadings or add parties is due by 7/20/2023. The expert discovery cut-off is 12/20/2024. The Last date to conduct settlement conference is 3/27/2024. Stipulations extending dates set by the Court are not effective unless approved by the Court, and without compelling factual support and a showing of due diligence, stipulations continuing dates set by the Court will be denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl) |
|
21 | 21
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 06/05 9:12 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar, with no appearances necessary on June 8, 2023. The Court will issue the Scheduling Order based solely on the parties filings pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16(b). The Requests for Zoom19 2 are denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Leave
Fri 06/02 3:35 PM
REQUEST to appear remotely for Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Nissan North America Inc.. Request set for hearing on 6/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Richardson, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appear
Fri 06/02 2:39 PM
REQUEST for Leave of Alastair F. Hamblin to Appear for CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY REMOTE VIDEO CONFERENCE; filed by Plaintiffs Larry Bailey, Gerald Howard Unrot. Request set for hearing on 6/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (Hamblin, Alastair) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 05/25 4:20 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiffs Larry Bailey, Gerald Howard Unrot.. (Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 04/12 4:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nissan North America Inc., identifying Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Richardson, Jason) |
|
16 | 16
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 04/12 3:34 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. (kd) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 04/12 9:44 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (yl) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 04/11 3:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Nissan North America Inc..(Attorney Jason M Richardson added to party Nissan North America Inc.(pty:dft))(Richardson, Jason) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 03/31 10:51 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: This matter has been assigned to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's website under Judge Frimpong's Procedures and Schedules. Please read the Standing Order carefully. It is the responsibilities of the parties to maintain familiarly with the Standing Order and any future amendments that the Court may issue by periodically checking the Court's website for the operative version of the Standing Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 03/27 8:19 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gerald Howard Unrot, Larry Bailey, upon Defendant Nissan North America Inc. served on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 3:55 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Nissan North America Inc.. (sh) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:53 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 03/20 11:35 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alastair F Hamblin counsel for Plaintiffs Larry Bailey, Gerald Howard Unrot. Adding Alastair F. Hamblin as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Howard Unrot and Larry Bailey. (Attorney Alastair F Hamblin added to party Larry Bailey (pty:pla), Attorney Alastair F Hamblin added to party Gerald Howard Unrot (pty:pla))(Hamblin, Alastair) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 03/20 11:34 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael H Rosenstein counsel for Plaintiffs Larry Bailey, Gerald Howard Unrot. Adding Michael H. Rosenstein as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Howard Unrot and Larry Bailey. (Attorney Michael H Rosenstein added to party Larry Bailey (pty:pla), Attorney Michael H Rosenstein added to party Gerald Howard Unrot (pty:pla))(Rosenstein, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Mon 03/20 11:32 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sepehr Daghighian counsel for Plaintiffs Larry Bailey, Gerald Howard Unrot. Adding Sepehr Daghighian as counsel of record for Plaintiffs for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Howard Unrot and Larry Bailey. (Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 11:30 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Larry Bailey, Gerald Howard Unrot, identifying Nissan North America, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 11:05 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs Larry Bailey, Gerald Howard Unrot. (Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 11:04 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Larry Bailey, Gerald Howard Unrot. (Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 11:01 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34983814 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Gerald Howard Unrot, Larry Bailey. (Attorney Sepehr Daghighian added to party Larry Bailey (pty:pla), Attorney Sepehr Daghighian added to party Gerald Howard Unrot (pty:pla))(Daghighian, Sepehr) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C |