Fisher v. 9225 West Charleston Blvd Apartments LLC
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Miranda M Du |
Referred: | Brenda Weksler |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00418 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court, 22E038599 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
9225 West Charleston Blvd Apartments LLC
|
|
Defendant
David F. Brown
|
|
Defendant
Chris Alireza Karsaz
|
|
Defendant
Eric R. Newmark
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Fisher
8465 W Sahara Blvd #111-668
Las Vegas, NV 89117 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Case
Tue 08/08 3:25 PM
ORDER. The court issued a notice of intent to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m) unless proof of service is filed by August 4, 2023 (ECF No.14 ). Accordingly, it is ordered, adjudged, and decreed that this action is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. This case is now closed. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Notice 4m Dismissal
Wed 07/05 11:24 AM
NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * complaint * in this action was filed on * 3/20/2023. * To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to * 9225 West Charleston Blvd Apartments LLC, David F. Brown, Chris Alireza Karsaz, Eric R. Newmark. * FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 8/4/2023. (WJ) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
misc
QC Notice
Fri 04/07 9:41 AM
SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Plaintiff. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/14/2023. (no image attached) (EDS) |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice Other
Thu 04/06 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Interest by Kevin Fisher. (CJS) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
misc
QC Notice
Thu 03/30 6:15 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Kevin Fisher. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/6/2023. (no image attached) (WJ) |
||
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice Other
Mon 03/27 9:23 AM
NOTICE - WRIT OF ERROR by Kevin Fisher. (DLS) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice Other
Mon 03/27 9:21 AM
NOTICE - AVERTMENT OF JURISDICTION by Kevin Fisher.. (DLS) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Petition Writ of Mandamus
Mon 03/27 9:12 AM
Writ of Mandamus by Kevin Fisher. (DLS) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice Other
Wed 03/22 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Documents in Support by Kevin Fisher. (DLS) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice Other
Wed 03/22 9:38 AM
NOTICE to Withdraw Notice of Praecipe for Judicial Review (ECF No.4 ) by Kevin Fisher. (DLS) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice Other
Wed 03/22 9:35 AM
NOTICE to Withdraw Notice of Distress of Bond (ECF No.2 ) by Kevin Fisher. (DLS) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Tue 03/21 7:35 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (DRM) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Request Judicial Notice
Tue 03/21 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Praecipe for Judicial Review by Plaintiff Kevin Fisher. (CJS) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice Other
Mon 03/20 1:47 PM
NOTICE Of Distress of Bond... by Kevin Fisher.. (DLS) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/20 1:43 PM
COMPLAINT - (Filing fee $402, paid, receipt number 2-3169 by Kevin Fisher. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/30/2023. Proof of service due by 6/18/2023. (DLS) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt of Filing Fee | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Mon 03/20 10:26 AM
Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (TRW) |