Abercrombie & Fitch Trading, Co v. Beauty Encounter, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00496 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 2:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Beauty Encounter, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Gail M Title
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abercrombie & Fitch Trading, Co.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Kent Raygor
Terminated: 08/10/2023
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
132 | 132
judgmentCV
Permanent Injunction
Wed 04/17 10:18 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RE PERMANENT INJUNCTION125 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu against defendant HAZ International, Inc. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: 1. HAZ and its agents, servants, successors, and assigns are hereby permanently restrained and enjoined from infringing upon the Abercrombie Marks. (See order for details.) (lom) |
|
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
131 | 131
stip
Dismiss Party
Wed 04/10 5:13 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Nandansons International, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Abercrombie & Fitch Trading, Co..(Currie, Tara) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
130 | 130
stip
Dismiss Party
Tue 04/09 11:25 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant HAZ International, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Abercrombie & Fitch Trading, Co..(Currie, Tara) |