Caron v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Anne R Traum |
Referred: | Craig S Denney |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00114 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago |
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice Other
Wed 01/31 8:56 AM
NOTICE by William Caron. (GA) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Tue 01/23 8:25 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.11 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 1/22/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stipulation
Thu 01/18 4:55 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Interested Party Nevada Department of Corrections. (Rands, Douglas) (dismissal) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Status Report
Thu 01/18 4:40 PM
STATUS REPORT Report of the Office of the Attorney General Re: Results of the 90 Day Stay by Interested Party Nevada Department of Corrections.. (Rands, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2023 | ||
minutes
Early Mediation Conference
Tue 12/19 10:34 AM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Mediation Conference held on 12/19/2023 before Mediator Andrew Craner. Crtrm Administrator: Karen Walker ; Pla Counsel: William Caron, Pro Se ; Def Counsel: Douglas Rands (NDOC Rep: A.W. LeGrand) ; Court Reporter: Liberty Court Recorder ; Time of Hearing: 8:30 a.m. ; Recording start and end times: 10:14:36 a.m. - 10:22:31 a.m. ; Courtroom: 2 . 1st mediation session. A settlement was reached. The terms of the Agreement are stated on the record. The Agreement was reduced to writing and signed by all parties at the mediation. Mr. Rands will file the Stipulation and Proposed Order of Dismissal with Prejudice to the Court within 7 days of NDOC's compliance with the terms of the Agreement. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the subject matter during the finalization of the documents, and until the Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice is entered. Thereafter, the jurisdiction of the Court shall be terminated. Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice due no later than February 2, 2024 . (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW) |
||
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
10
pgs
order
Order Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference
Tue 11/07 11:15 AM
ORDER Setting Inmate Early Mediation Conference for Tuesday, December 19, 2023, at 8:30 a.m. by video conference before Mediator Andrew Craner. The parties' mediation statements must be received by the court no later than 4:00 p.m., on Tuesday, December 5, 2023. DO NOT FILE THE MEDIATION STATEMENTS; DO NOT SERVE A COPY ON OPPOSING COUNSEL. See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 11/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Limited Notice Appearance of Counsel
Wed 11/01 2:03 PM
LIMITED NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas R Rands on behalf of Interested Party Nevada Department of Corrections. Limited Notice of Appearance (Rands, Douglas) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint Amended
Mon 10/23 10:02 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by William Caron. (Filed pursuant to ECF No.5 Order; E-service to AG; copy to P.) (DRM) |
|
5 | 5
11
pgs
order
Order on Motion/Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Screening Order
Mon 10/23 9:22 AM
SCREENING ORDER on FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT - A decision of ECF No.1 IFP applications remains deferred. The duplicate IFP application (ECF No.4 ) is denied as moot. Clerk is directed to file the FAC (ECF No.4 -1). The FAC is the operative complaint. Claims will proceed, as detailed herein. Defendants NDOC and NDOC medical director John Doe are both dismissed with prejudice from this action This action is stayed 90 days to allow parties to settle. 90-day report due by 1/21/2024. If case does not settle, Plaintiff will be required to pay the full filing fee. Clerk is directed to add the Nevada Department of Corrections to the docket as an Interested Party and e-serve a copy of this order, and the FAC on the AG by adding AG to the docket. (E-service 10/23/2023; Complaint served upon subsequent filing.) AG shall advise within 21 days of the date of the entry of this order (11/13/2023) re acceptance of service for the purpose of participation in the Mediation Program. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 10/20/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Att: 1 Copy of Complaint for Plaintiff | ||
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 03/30 9:53 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William Caron.(DRM) |
|
Att: 1 First Amended Complaint , | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 03/27 1:33 PM
ORDERED that this action will be subject to dismissal without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to file a signed amended complaint by April 26, 2023 . Clerk will send Plaintiff Caron the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions for the same, and a copy of his original complaint, including exhibits (ECF No.1 -1). (Form, instr., complaint copy attached hereto for distribution to P via LCC law library.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 3/27/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) |
|
Att: 1 1983 form and instructions, | ||
Att: 2 Copy of Complaint for Plaintiff | ||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas
Mon 03/20 11:48 AM
ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (CJS) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Motion/Application Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 11:45 AM
MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff William Caron.(CJS) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |