Diane K. Godfrey v. Regents of University of California et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02068 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fraud |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Stanley Mosk Courthouse, 23STCV04785 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:03 AM PDT |
Defendant
Federal Express Company Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Livermore Optometry Group, erroneously sued as Livermore Optometry, Inc.
Hewitt & Raphael 21550 Oxnard Street Suite 880
Woodland Hills, CA 91367 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The UPS Store Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tenet California Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Regents of University of California
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ray Stone Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medical Board of California
|
|
Defendant
McNaughton Newspapers Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Times
|
|
Defendant
Gagnon Vision Medical Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Stanford Health Care
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Doctors Medical Center of Modesto Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dignity Health Medical Foundation Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dental Board of California
|
|
Defendant
California Physicians Assistant Board
|
|
Defendant
California Board of Pharmacy
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
California Board of Optometry
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Animal Legal Defense Fund Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Diane K. Godfrey
2769 Castle Hill Court Apt 34
Sacramento, CA 95821 |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
93 | 93
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 03/14 4:30 PM
(IN CHAMBERS)ORDER by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. This case should have been closed on entry dated August 17, 202392 . (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl) |