Amanda Bare v. Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sherilyn Peace Garnett |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02065 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital
|
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Bare
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 08/14 12:43 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by Plaintiff Amanda Bare.(Morin, Richard) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 07/13 3:57 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: On July 12, 2023, Plaintiff filed Notice of Settlement (Dkt. No. 15). The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for August 16, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal by August 14, 2023, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All pending dates are vacated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Settlement
Wed 07/12 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Amanda Bare. (Morin, Richard) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 06/01 11:51 AM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3)13 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The Court, having considered the Parties stipulation, and finding good cause therefor, hereby GRANTS the stipulation and ORDERS as follows: Defendant shall respond to the initial complaint no later than June 30, 2023. (rolm) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Wed 05/31 12:38 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 30, 2023 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Amanda Bare.(Morin, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 11, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 05/11 12:08 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital answer now due 5/31/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Amanda Bare.(Morin, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 04/25 3:35 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital answer now due 5/15/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Amanda Bare.(Morin, Richard) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/10 9:04 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Amanda Bare, upon Defendant Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital served on 4/8/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kevin A. Klockenga, Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Morin, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 11:11 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 6:08 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Henry Mayo Newhall Memorial Hospital. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 6:04 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 6:04 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 6:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 2:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Amanda Bare, (Morin, Richard) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 2:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Amanda Bare. (Morin, Richard) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 2:10 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Amanda Bare. (Morin, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 2:10 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34986357 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Amanda Bare. (Attorney Richard J Morin added to party Amanda Bare(pty:pla))(Morin, Richard) |