Kimberly Frazier v. Fisch Properties, L.P. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sherilyn Peace Garnett |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02067 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 2:33 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Fisch Properties L.P.
|
|
Plaintiff
Kimberly Frazier
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Mon 07/10 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 07/07 3:22 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: On July 6, 2023, Plaintiff filed Notice of Settlement (Dkt. No. 14). The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for August 9, 2023, at 1:30 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal by August 7, 2023, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All pending dates are vacated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Settlement
Thu 07/06 4:34 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 06/16 1:24 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier, upon Defendant Fisch Properties L.P. served on 6/8/2023, answer due 6/29/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Laura Aflalo, As Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Kim, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Response
Tue 04/04 3:00 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazierto Order to Show Cause,11 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 03/21 2:43 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER THE STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause within fourteen (14) days of this order. (et) |
|
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 03/21 2:40 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) STANDING ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The court finds that good cause exists to institute a limited scheduling order for cases under the ADA involving physical barriers in places of public accommodation. (et) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 10:25 AM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 9:59 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Fisch Properties L.P.. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 9:54 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 9:53 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 2:23 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 2:23 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 2:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kimberly Frazier. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 2:22 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34986531 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Kimberly Frazier(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |