Skeeter Betty v. Weber and Associates, Inc.
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Otis D Wright, II |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02070 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 19, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:58 AM PDT |
Defendant
Weber and Associates, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Skeeter Betty
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 03/19 1:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: In light of the Mediators Report, the Court ordered the parties to file a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 by March 18, 2024. (ECF No. 33.) TheCourt noted that "[f]ailure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action." Having received no response to the Courts Order, this case is hereby DISMISSED. The Clerk of the Court shall close the case. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Thu 02/01 12:09 PM
In light of the Mediators Report, (ECF No. 32), indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed on inactive status. By March 18, 2024, the parties shall file a dismissal that complies with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41. Failure to timely comply with this order shall result in the dismissal of this action. All other dates and deadlines in this action are VACATED and taken off calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled
Wed 01/31 2:22 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) Kim S Zeldin : Mediation held on Cancelled Mediation Date and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Zeldin, Kim) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Mon 01/22 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for April 2, 2024.(Zeldin, Kim) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 12/04 8:12 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. In light of Plaintiff's December 1, 2023 withdrawal of his motion to compel discovery, the hearing scheduled for December 7 is VACATED and the Clerk is directed to terminate the gavel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (bem) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
Fri 12/01 4:24 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Application to Compel,24 filed by Plaintiff Skeeter Betty. (Javitch, Mark) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Declaration (Motion related)
Thu 11/30 5:56 PM
DECLARATION of Keven Steinberg Re Compliance with Discovery and Initial Disclosures First APPLICATION to Compel further discovery responses and initial disclosures from Defendant Weber & Associates, Inc. 24 filed by Defendant Weber and Associates, Inc.. (Steinberg, Keven) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form
Mon 11/27 1:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Kim S Zeldin has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Friday, November 24, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 11/24 12:38 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of First APPLICATION to Compel further discovery responses and initial disclosures from Defendant Weber & Associates, Inc. 24 filed by Plaintiff Skeeter Betty.(Javitch, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in support of Reply in support of Motion to Compel, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Thu 11/16 11:17 PM
Opposition Opposition re: First APPLICATION to Compel further discovery responses and initial disclosures from Defendant Weber & Associates, Inc. 24 filed by Defendant Weber and Associates, Inc..(Steinberg, Keven) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel | ||
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Compel
Thu 11/09 5:12 PM
First APPLICATION to Compel further discovery responses and initial disclosures from Defendant Weber & Associates, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Skeeter Betty. Application set for hearing on 12/7/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth.(Javitch, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-E attached to Javitch Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 27, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Wed 09/27 3:13 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (lc) |
|
22 | 22
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/27 3:10 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (JURY TRIAL) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. This Order is to advise the parties and counsel of the schedule that will govern this case. THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2024 01:30 PM; Jury Trial set for 10/8/2024 09:00 AM ; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 9/30/2024 at 01:30 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Tue 09/26 7:39 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-3 days, filed by Plaintiff Skeeter Betty.. (Javitch, Mark) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Disclosure
Fri 08/04 12:55 PM
DISCLOSURE of Certificate of Interested Parties re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)18 filed by Defendant Weber and Associates, Inc. (Steinberg, Keven) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 08/03 9:10 AM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Scheduling Conference set for 10/16/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. This case has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Otis D. Wright II. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the court as well. In order "to secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are hereby ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 08/02 12:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Weber & Associates, Inc. Weber and Associates, Inc..(Steinberg, Keven) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 06/30 2:28 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Weber and Associates, Inc. answer now due 8/2/2023, filed by Defendant Weber & Associates, Inc. Weber and Associates, Inc..(Attorney Keven Steinberg added to party Weber and Associates, Inc.(pty:dft))(Steinberg, Keven) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Response
Thu 05/04 3:57 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Skeeter Bettyto Order on Motion for Clerk to Enter Default,,14 (Javitch, Mark) |
|
15 | 15
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 05/04 3:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Skeeter Betty. upon Weber and Associates, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/4/2023, answer due 7/3/2023. Waiver of Service signed by Keven Steinberg, Attorney for Defendant. (Javitch, Mark) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Clerk to Enter Default
Mon 04/24 11:36 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: On April 21, 2023, Plaintiff Skeeter Betty requested the Clerk enter default against Defendant Weber and Associates, Inc.12 . The Clerk issued a Notice of Deficiency re Default/Default Judgment noting deficiencies in the Request and Proof ofService, and referred the Request to the Court13 . For the reasonsidentified in the Notice of Deficiency, the Request for Entry of Default is DENIED. Within ten (10) calendar days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file an amended Request/ Application and Amended Proof of Service, correcting the noted deficiencies, to have Request for Entry of Default reconsidered. (lc) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Deficiency - Default /Default Judgment (CV-52b) - optional html form
Mon 04/24 9:51 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Weber and Associates, Inc.12 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. Proof of Service is lacking required information. Proof of Service is lacking required information. Proof of service lacks agent's last name; only identified as : Tony R., including abbreviations as "A.M.,50, G,BR", served at Legalzoom.com. Inc. address. Clerk is unable to determine the propriety of service nor can presume what or if the abbreviations are re agent's physical description. Since filer's request is in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause, clerk has referred request to the Judge. (lc) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Fri 04/21 11:01 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Weber and Associates, Inc. filed by plaintiff Skeeter Betty. (Javitch, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Mark L. Javitch in support of Plaintiff's Request for Clerk's Default | ||
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/20 10:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff(s) is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE IN WRITING no later than April 21, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendant. Answer by the defendant(s). In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 04/04 7:34 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Skeeter Betty, upon Defendant Weber and Associates, Inc. served on 3/29/2023, answer due 4/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and no service by mail was executed.Original Summons returned. (Javitch, Mark) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 03/22 1:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR EXCEPT FOR motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the US District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 3:15 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Weber and Associates, Inc. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 3:13 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 3:12 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 3:12 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 3:06 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Skeeter Betty. (Javitch, Mark) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 3:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Skeeter Betty, identifying none. (Javitch, Mark) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 2:54 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Skeeter Betty. (Javitch, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34986783 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Skeeter Betty. (Attorney Mark Louis Javitch added to party Skeeter Betty(pty:pla))(Javitch, Mark) |