Farshad Ghafari et al v. Princess Cruise Lines, LTD et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Monica Ramirez Almadani |
Referred: | Steve Kim |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02077 |
Nature of Suit | 340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:30 AM PDT |
Defendant
Steiner Transocean Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steiner Leisure Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steiner US Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Elemis USA Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steiner American Cruises Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zahra Ghafari
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Farshad Ghafari
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fargol Ghafari
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doreen Ghafari
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
49 | 49
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Fri 03/29 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request46 , Summons Request47 , Summons Request48 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Incorrect Judge's initials next to case number. Next to Summons in a civil Action, please add "on the Second Amended Complaint". The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
48 | 48
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/27 4:37 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,45 filed by Plaintiff Doreen Ghafari, Fargol Ghafari, Farshad Ghafari, Zahra Ghafari. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
47 | 47
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/27 4:31 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,45 filed by Plaintiff Doreen Ghafari, Fargol Ghafari, Farshad Ghafari, Zahra Ghafari. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
46 | 46
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/27 4:26 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,45 filed by Plaintiff Doreen Ghafari, Fargol Ghafari, Farshad Ghafari, Zahra Ghafari. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
45 | 45
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Mon 03/18 8:49 AM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Carel U.SA. Inc., Carel Industries S.p.A., C.M.V. Construzioni Meccaniche Varie-SRL amending Amended Complaint/Petition24 , filed by Plaintiffs Doreen Ghafari, Zahra Ghafari, Fargol Ghafari, Farshad Ghafari(Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
44 | 44
order
Amend/Correct
Thu 03/14 1:36 PM
ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD PARTIES [ECF NO. 42] by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint to Add Parties is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint on or before March 18, 2024. (lom) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Statement
Mon 03/11 11:02 AM
STATEMENT Joint Case Management Statement filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. in compliance re: Order41 .(Nield, Edgar) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 03/08 10:55 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Amended Complaint/Petition24 filed by plaintiffs Fargol Ghafari, Farshad Ghafari, Zahra Ghafari. Motion set for hearing on 5/16/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Second Amended Complaint), | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
4
pgs
order
Order
Tue 02/27 8:43 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. See Order for details. (gga) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2024 | ||
40 | 40
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Fri 02/23 5:31 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#24-028) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani, this case is transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-02077-MRA (SKx). (et) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Thu 02/22 10:15 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 5/13/2025. Joint status report re settlement due by 5/20/2025. (gk) |
|
38 | 38
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 02/22 10:13 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court has scheduled the dates set forth on the last page of this Order after review of the parties' Joint Scheduling Conference Report. Therefore, the Court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2025 02:00 PM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Jury Trial set for 7/15/2025 08:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for further details. (gk) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 11/27 12:05 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on December 8, 2023. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 11/27 3:05 PM
ORDER DISMISSING STEINER ENTITIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The parties' Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal of Steiner Transocean Limited; Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc.; Steiner Leisure Limited; Steiner American Cruises, Inc.; Steiner US Holding Inc.; Elemis USA Inc.; Onespaworld U.S. Inc.; and Onespaworld Holdings Limited (the "Steiner Entities") without Prejudice35 is APPROVED. The Order to Show Cause, dated 11/17/202334 is DISCHARGED. (gk) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
stip
Dismiss Party
Mon 11/20 3:08 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss defendant Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited, OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc. filed by Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd..(Nield, Edgar) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 11/17 10:52 AM
MINUTES IN CHAMBERS- ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before November 27, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendants Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S., Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner Us Holdings Inc., Elemis USA, Inc., OneSpaWorld U.S., Inc., and OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited for lack of prosecution. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 11/09 11:54 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 10-14, filed by Defendants Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited, OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc...(Nield, Edgar) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial & Trial Dates Worksheet, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
notice
Clerical Error (G-11)
Wed 11/08 12:59 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Order re Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference Date filed 11/7/202331 , Due to clerical error, the docket text has been updated to reflect that the Scheduling Conference is continued to 12/8/2023 at 9:30 AM. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, November 07, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/08 11:51 AM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DATE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation30 is APPROVED. The Scheduling Conference is continued to 12/8/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee, and shall be by videoconference. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Hearing
Tue 10/31 4:27 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Hearing re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only29 filed by defendants Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited, OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc..(DeSantis Nield, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 10/10 1:37 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/10/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 11/24/2023 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 10/06 5:02 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition24 filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd..(Maltzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
2
pgs
order
Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 09/07 4:03 PM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Stipulation26 is approved. The time for Defendants Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc., Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited to respond to the First Amended Complaint24 is extended by 30 days. The deadline for all Defendants to file a response is moved to 10/9/2023. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Tue 09/05 2:56 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. answer now due 9/8/2023, re Amended Complaint/Petition24 filed by defendants Steiner Transocean Limited; Elemis USA Inc.; Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc.; Steiner American Cruises Inc.; OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc.; Steiner Leisure Limited; Steiner US Holdings Inc.; OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited; Princess Cruise Lines Ltd..(Nield, Edgar) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Edgar R. Nield, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, August 28, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
order
Dismiss
Wed 08/30 7:19 AM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 8/25/2023, Plaintiffs filed a First Amended Complaint as a matter of course under Rule 15(a)24 . In light of the foregoing, Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss filed on 8/14/202323 is DENIED without prejudice as moot. The 9/15/2023 hearing on that motion is VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Fri 08/25 8:02 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , filed by Plaintiffs Doreen Ghafari, Zahra Ghafari, Fargol Ghafari, Farshad Ghafari(Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 08/14 4:28 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Count 8 of Plaintiffs Complaint filed by defendants Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited, OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/15/2023 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (DeSantis Nield, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
Fri 07/07 5:13 PM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation21 is approved. The time for Defendants PRINCESS CRUISE LINES, LTD., STEINER TRANSOCEAN LIMITED, STEINER TRANSOCEAN U.S. INC., STEINER LEISURE LIMITED, STEINER AMERICAN CRUISES INC., STEINER US HOLDING INC., ELEMIS USA INC., ONESPAWORLD U.S. INC., ONESPAWORLD HOLDINGS LIMITED to respond to the Complaint is extended to 8/14/2023. (gk) |
|
21 | 21
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 07/06 12:53 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by defendants Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited, OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc..(Nield, Edgar) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Edgar R. Nield, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
Fri 06/16 9:42 AM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation19 is granted. The time for Defendants Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc., Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., and OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited to respond to the Complaint is extended to 7/13/2023. (gk) |
|
19 | 19
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 06/15 10:59 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by defendants Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited, OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc..(DeSantis Nield, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Gabrielle De Santis Nield, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 01, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order Extending Answer Due Deadline
Tue 05/02 10:18 AM
ORDER RE EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSES TO COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulation14 is APPROVED. The deadline for all Defendants to file a response is 6/23/2023. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Appearance
Tue 04/25 5:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendants Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited, OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc.(Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Elemis USA Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Steiner American Cruises Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Steiner Leisure Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Steiner Transocean Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Steiner US Holdings Inc.(pty:dft))(Maltzman, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
16 | 16
notice
Appearance
Tue 04/25 5:04 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edgar R Nield on behalf of Defendants Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited, OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc.(Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Elemis USA Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Steiner American Cruises Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Steiner Leisure Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Steiner Transocean Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Steiner US Holdings Inc.(pty:dft))(Nield, Edgar) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
15 | 15
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 04/25 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendants Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited, OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc., identifying Carnival Corporation.(DeSantis Nield, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 04/25 4:56 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by defendants Elemis USA Inc., OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited, OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., Princess Cruise Lines Ltd., Steiner American Cruises Inc., Steiner Leisure Limited, Steiner Transocean Limited, Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc., Steiner US Holdings Inc..(Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party Elemis USA Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party OneSpaWorld Holdings Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party Steiner American Cruises Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party Steiner Leisure Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party Steiner Transocean Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party Steiner Transocean U.S. Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis Nield added to party Steiner US Holdings Inc.(pty:dft))(DeSantis Nield, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Gabrielle De Santis Nield, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/03 5:20 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Doreen Ghafari, Zahra Ghafari, Fargol Ghafari, Farshad Ghafari, upon Defendant Princess Cruise Lines Ltd. served on 4/3/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 04/03 2:35 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Doreen Ghafari, Zahra Ghafari, Fargol Ghafari, Farshad Ghafari, upon Defendant OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc. served on 3/24/2023, answer due 4/14/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 03/22 1:55 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/21 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Doreen Ghafari, Fargol Ghafari, Farshad Ghafari, Zahra Ghafari, (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Tue 03/21 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (sh) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 12:48 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc., Princess Cruise Lines Ltd.. (sh) |
|
Att: 1 OneSpaWorld U.S. Inc | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 11:47 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 11:46 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (sh) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 3:51 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs DOREEN GHAFARI, FARGOL GHAFARI, FARSHAD GHAFARI, ZAHRA GHAFARI. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 3:46 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Plaintiffs DOREEN GHAFARI, FARGOL GHAFARI, FARSHAD GHAFARI, ZAHRA GHAFARI. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 3:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs DOREEN GHAFARI, FARGOL GHAFARI, FARSHAD GHAFARI, ZAHRA GHAFARI. (Llinas Negret, Carlos) |
|
1 | 1
51
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 3:35 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34987701 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs DOREEN GHAFARI, ZAHRA GHAFARI, FARGOL GHAFARI, FARSHAD GHAFARI. (Attorney Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret added to party DOREEN GHAFARI(pty:pla), Attorney Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret added to party FARGOL GHAFARI(pty:pla), Attorney Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret added to party FARSHAD GHAFARI(pty:pla), Attorney Carlos Felipe Llinas Negret added to party ZAHRA GHAFARI(pty:pla))(Llinas Negret, Carlos) |