Korttney Elliott v. Jeaman Kim et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00503 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 8:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Jeaman Kim
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Korttney Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 05/02 3:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))15 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 05/02 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
12
pgs
order
Order
Mon 04/10 10:42 AM
ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS UNRUH ACT CLAIM AND RELATED STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Response
Wed 04/05 2:50 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliottto Order to Show Cause,12 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Wed 03/29 11:40 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFFS UNRUH ACT CLAIM AND RELATED STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 4/5/2023. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 1:10 PM
ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. (rrp) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/21 11:57 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Jeaman Kim. (ghap) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/21 11:48 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,8 Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Tue 03/21 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 9:42 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 9:42 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 9:41 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 4:03 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 4:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 4:01 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 4:00 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34988373 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Korttney Elliott(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |