Moreno v. Elizardo et al
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Richard F Boulware, II |
Referred: | Cam Ferenbach |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00422 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle ( |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2023 |
Case in other court: | District Court, A-22-857818-C |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ashley Marie Elizardo
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Defendant
Allstate Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maricarmen Moreno
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
3
pgs
order
Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/24 11:47 AM
ORDER Granting13 Stipulation for Dismissal without Prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that ASHLEY MARIE ELIZARDO be dismissed from the above-entitled matter without prejudice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that CASE NO.: 2:23-cv-00422-RFB-VCF be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ALZ) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stipulation
Wed 08/23 11:45 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL without Prejudice by Plaintiff Maricarmen Moreno. (Burk, Christopher) (dismissal) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 04/24 4:22 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ashley Marie Elizardo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Sarah) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
5
pgs
order
Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Mon 04/17 1:18 PM
ORDER Granting9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 10/19/2023. Motions due by 11/20/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/20/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order
Mon 04/17 10:29 AM
Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Intervenor Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Weinerman, Deleela) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/17 10:28 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVAL by Intervenor Defendant Allstate Insurance Company.. (Weinerman, Deleela) |
|
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Mon 04/17 1:18 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (LOE) |
||
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Tue 04/11 12:55 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allstate Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Weinerman, Deleela) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 03/27 8:49 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Maricarmen Moreno that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Burk, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
minord
Minute Order Removal Case
Tue 03/21 6:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/21/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/5/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/20/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) |
|
order
Standing Order
Tue 03/21 6:58 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) |
||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Statement in Removal Case
Mon 03/20 4:18 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Intervenor Defendant Allstate Insurance Company..(Weinerman, Deleela) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
2 | 2
misc
Certificate Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 4:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Allstate Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Weinerman, Deleela) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition Removal
Mon 03/20 4:15 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Case Number a-22-857818-c, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7241352) by Allstate Insurance Company. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/30/2023. (Weinerman, Deleela) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit a, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L | ||
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Tue 03/21 6:58 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (TRW) |