Therabody, Inc. v. Dominion Sourcing, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02086 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:55 AM PDT |
Defendant
Dominion Sourcing, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David C. Walton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Therabody, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 06/23 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Therabody, Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Levin, Jesse) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Amend/Correct
Wed 06/14 4:54 PM
Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and forum non conveniens, and failure to state a claim 22 and forum non conveniens, and failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Dominion Sourcing, LLC, David C. Walton. Motion set for hearing on 7/14/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attorney Michael M. Kowsari added to party Dominion Sourcing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael M. Kowsari added to party David C. Walton(pty:dft)) (Kowsari, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF D. WALTON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FORUM NON CONVENIENS, AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM | ||
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 06/13 4:42 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER advancing motion hearing and mandatory scheduling conference by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court is in receipt of Defendants' motion to dismiss. Dkt. No.22 . The Court ADVANCES the hearing on Plaintiffs motion and the mandatory scheduling conference to July 14, 2023 in person in Courtroom 6C. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion is due June 23, 2023 and any reply is due June 30, 2023. The parties' joint Rule 26(f) report is due July 5, 2023. The parties are ordered to meet and confer about the motion to dismiss before Plaintiff's opposition deadline to attempt to narrow the issues in dispute.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Tue 06/13 11:42 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and forum non conveniens, and failure to state a claim 22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-3 compliance statement missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) |
|
24 | 24
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 06/13 6:41 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on July 28, 2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by July 18, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 06/12 6:16 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Dominion Sourcing, LLC, David C. Walton, (Bolling, Jesse) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 06/12 6:12 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and forum non conveniens, and failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Dominion Sourcing, LLC, David C. Walton. Motion set for hearing on 7/28/2023 at 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Attorney Jesse K Bolling added to party Dominion Sourcing, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jesse K Bolling added to party David C. Walton(pty:dft)) (Bolling, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF D. WALTON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND FORUM NON CONVENIENS, AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM | ||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/03 4:47 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE18 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc., designating Jesse Bernard Levin as local counsel. Granting18 Non-Resident Attorney Kyle D. Stroup. (rolm) |
|
20 | 20
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 04/03 4:44 PM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE17 by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc., designating Jesse Bernard Levin as local counsel. Granting17 Non-Resident Attorney Alex E. Jones. (rolm) |
|
19 | 19
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 04/03 11:08 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER re: Pro Hac Vice Applications (Dkt. Nos.11 ,12 ,14 and15 ) by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: On April 3, 2023, Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. filed two pro hac vice applications in response to the Clerk's Notice of Deficiency at Dkt. No.16 . The Court STRIKES the applications filed by Plaintiff at Dkt. Nos.11 ,12 ,14 and15 and reminds counsel the Court had not instructed Plaintiff to file renewed applications. The notice of deficiency issued by the Clerk at Dkt. Nos.13 and16 indicated the filer "need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so." Counsel is reminded to review notices issued by the Court thoroughly before refiling requests in the future. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 04/03 10:47 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KYLE B. STROUP to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/31/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC3503588612 15 ) filed by PLAINTIFF Therabody, Inc.. (Levin, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement KYLE B. STROUP | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Mon 04/03 10:44 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ALEX E. JONES to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/31/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-3503556311 14 ) filed by PLAINTIFF Therabody, Inc.. (Levin, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order ALEX E. JONES | ||
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Fri 03/31 5:39 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ALEX E. JONES to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/28/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-3503556311 )14 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KYLE B. STROUP to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/28/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC3503588612 )15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 3/22/23, Dkt. 5. (lt) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 03/30 2:39 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KYLE B. STROUP to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/28/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC3503588612 ) filed by PLAINTIFF Therabody, Inc.. (Levin, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order KYLE B. STROUP | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 03/30 2:34 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ALEX E. JONES to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 3/28/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-3503556311 ) filed by PLAINTIFF Therabody, Inc.. (Levin, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order ALEX E. JONES | ||
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Wed 03/29 5:00 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ALEX E. JONES to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35035886)12 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KYLE B. STROUP to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35035563)11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 03/28 1:57 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney ALEX E. JONES to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35035886) filed by PLAINTIFF Therabody, Inc.. (Levin, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order ALEX E. JONES | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 03/28 1:38 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney KYLE B. STROUP to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Therabody, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35035563) filed by PLAINTIFF Therabody, Inc.. (Levin, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order KYLE B. STROUP | ||
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 12:56 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kyle D. Stroup. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) |
|
9 | 9
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 12:55 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Alex E. Jones. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/22 12:53 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendants Dominion Sourcing, LLC, David C. Walton. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/22 12:31 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 12:30 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/22 12:30 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 6:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff THERABODY, INC.,. (Levin, Jesse) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 5:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF THERABODY, INC.,, (Levin, Jesse) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Mon 03/20 5:25 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by PLAINTIFF THERABODY, INC.,. (Levin, Jesse) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 5:14 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34989567 - Fee: $402, filed by PLAINTIFF THERABODY, INC.,. (Attorney Jesse Bernard Levin added to party THERABODY, INC.,(pty:pla))(Levin, Jesse) |
|
Att: 1 EXHIBIT 1, | ||
Att: 2 EXHIBIT 2, | ||
Att: 3 EXHIBIT 3, | ||
Att: 4 EXHIBIT 4, | ||
Att: 5 EXHIBIT 5, | ||
Att: 6 EXHIBIT 6, | ||
Att: 7 EXHIBIT 7 |