Keuntea Jermayne Vance v. Los Angeles Department of Child Support
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Brianna Fuller Mircheff |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02074 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:23 AM PDT |
Defendant
Los Angeles Department of Child Support
|
|
Plaintiff
Keuntea Jermayne Vance
19213 Princeton Avenue
Carson, CA 90746 |
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 04/25 7:12 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND DENYING IFP REQUEST by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court dismisses this action without prejudice and denies all pending requests and motions2 ,9 as moot. To the extent Plaintiff seeks emergency injunctive relief, his request is denied. ( MD JS-6, Case Terminated. ) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
cs_rasgn
Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent)
Fri 04/21 3:11 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 23-037 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the creation of the calendar of Magistrate Judge Brianna F. Mircheff, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases are transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Brianna F. Mircheff for all further proceedings All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 2:23-cv-02074 DMG(DFM) absent further order of the Court. (rn) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Temporary Restraining Order Preliminary Injunction
Thu 04/20 10:00 AM
EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order AND Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Keuntea Jermayne Vance. (es) |
|
8 | 8
attorney
Change of Address
Thu 04/20 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Change of address Changing plaintiffs address to 19213 Princeton Avenue, Carson CA 90746. Filed by Plaintiff Keuntea Jermayne Vance. (es) |
|
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/07 11:21 AM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING TITLE IV-D AND CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT IS AN ILLEGAL TREATY UNDER TRIBUNAL AND HAS NO REMEDY OR RECOURSE filed by Plaintiff Keuntea Jermayne Vance. (es) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Tue 03/21 4:15 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND DEFERRING RULING ON IFP REQUEST by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Because Plaintiff's complaint fails to state a claim upon which relief can be granted, the Court dismisses the complaint with leave to amend. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must file an amended complaint that addresses the issues raised herein by 4/20/2023. Failure to comply with this Order will be deemed a failure to prosecute and will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice. The Court will defer ruling on Plaintiff's IFP request2 at this time. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 4:51 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Keuntea Jermayne Vance. (ghap) |
|
3 | 3
8
pgs
misc
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Mon 03/20 4:50 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW REGARDING TITLE IV-D AND CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT IS AN ILLEGAL TREATY UNDER TRIBUNAL AND HAS NO REMEDY OR RECOURSE, filed by Plaintiff Keuntea Jermayne Vance. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 03/20 4:48 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Keuntea Jermayne Vance. (ghap) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Referred)
Mon 03/20 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT filed against Defendant Los Angeles Department of Child Support Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E Scott., filed by plaintiff Keuntea Jermayne Vance. (ghap) |
|
Att: 1 CV-71, | ||
Att: 2 Summons |