Share Our Selves Corporation v. City of Santa Ana et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | David O Carter |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00504 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 5:08 AM PDT |
Defendant
City of Santa Ana
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Share Our Selves Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
58 | 58
transcript
-Transcript Order Form (G-120)
Thu 02/22 10:11 AM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Share Our Selves Corporation for Court Smart (CS). Court will contact Nora Salem at nsalem@omm.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the transcription company. (Salem, Nora) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
57 | 57
textonly
Notice of Filing Transcript
Wed 02/21 8:35 AM
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/28/23 2:31 P.M. to 5:13 P.M. & 9/13/23 4:31 P.M. to 6:07 P.M. re Transcript55 ,56 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (apr) |
|
56 | 56
transcript
-Transcript
Wed 02/21 8:31 AM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 9/13/23 4:31 P.M. to 6:07 P.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/12/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2024. (apr) |
|
55 | 55
transcript
-Transcript
Wed 02/21 8:29 AM
TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/28/23 2:31 P.M. to 5:13 P.M.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: JAMS CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPTION, phone number (661) 609-4528. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 3/12/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/20/2024. (apr) |