Shirley Foose McClure et al v. David K. Gottlieb
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fred W Slaughter |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01982 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 12, 2023 |
Debtor
Shirley Foose McClure
, |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:39 AM PDT |
Appellant
Shirley Foose McClure
3401 Gregory Avenue
Fullerton, CA 92833 |
|
Appellee
David K. Gottlieb
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
Landau Law LLP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Bankruptcy Appeal Case Decision ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 12/12 12:02 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING Bankruptcy Appeal by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court DISMISSES this appeal WITHOUT PREJUDICE in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) See document for further information. (jp) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 09/11 10:21 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Appellee David K. Gottlieb, re Notice (Other)17 Proof of Service Re: Notice of Suggestion of Death of Debtor served on 09/11/23. (Masud, Laila) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 09/06 12:38 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REQUIRING Appellant to Serve Non-Party Successor-in-Interest by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court ORDERS Appellant to: (1) serve Mr. McClure with the Notice in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedures 25(a)(3); and (2) file proof of service with the court no later than 9/19/2023. In light of the Notice and service issue, the court sua sponte CONTINUES the deadline to file the briefs and other documents required to perfect this bankruptcy appeal under the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, including Rules 8009, 8014, and 8018, from 10/6/2023, to 11/3/2023. The court also VACATES the requirement that Debtor file a status report on 9/29/2023. (jp) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 06/30 6:01 PM
Notice of Suggestion of Death of Debtor filed by Appellee David K. Gottlieb. (Masud, Laila) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Stay Order (other)
Tue 06/06 3:57 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Appellant's Application for Stay15 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court CONTINUES the deadline for Appellant to file an opening brief and documents required by the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, including Rules 8009, 8014, and 8018, by one hundred and twenty (120) days. Therefore, Appellant shall file all necessary documents to perfect her appeal no later than 10/6/2023. To the extent that Appellant requires any additional continuance, Appellant shall file a status report on or before 9/29/2023. (See document for further information). (jp) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Stay Order (other)
Wed 05/31 5:53 PM
APPELLANT'S APPLICATION AND DECLARATION of Her Prior Application of April 11, 2023, Dkt. No. 13 for a Stay of the Proceedings Until She is Released to Return to Participation in this Appeal by her Cardiac Surgeon after her heart Valve Surgery to be Performed at UCLA on or before 6/5/2023 filed by Appellant Shirley Foose McClure.. (jp) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Stay Order (other) Continue
Wed 05/03 12:50 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING in Part and DENYING in Part Appellant's Application for Stay13 by Judge Fred W. Slaughter: The court CONTINUES the deadline for Appellant to file an opening brief and documents required by the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, including Rules 8009, 8014, and 8018, by thirty (30) days, from the date of this Order. Therefore, Appellant shall file all necessary documents to perfect her appeal on or before June 2, 2023. The court also ORDERS Appellant to file a status report on or before June 2, 2023, including a declaration that complies with Local Rule 7-6 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56. (See document for further information). (jp) |
|
Thursday, April 13, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Stay Order (other) Continue
Wed 04/19 3:46 PM
APPLICATION to Stay of Proceedings Due to the Appellants Serious Health Issues and Upcoming Heart Surgery, or in the Alternative, a Continuance of the Appellants Opening Brief Until 6/30/2023 filed by Appellant Shirley Foose McClure.. (jp) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Tue 04/11 1:27 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:22-cv-00177-FWS. Case transferred from Judge Jesus G. Bernal to Judge Fred W. Slaughter for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01982-FWS. Signed by Judge Fred W. Slaughter (ap) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Response
Wed 04/05 3:46 PM
Appellant's RESPONSE and Clarification to Docket No. 5 RE Notice of Deficiency in Appeal From Bankruptcy Court filed by Appellant Shirley Foose McClure (twdb) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Related Case(s)
Wed 04/05 3:45 PM
Appellant's Certification of Interested Parties and NOTICE of Related Case(s) Under C.D. Cal Rule 2.1(8012) RE: Notice of Appeal, [Bankr.Doc.No. 2260 Filed on 2/2/23, RE Order Bankr. DOC. No. 2248, Filed on 1/25/23] filed by appellant Shirley Foose McClure. Related Case(s): 1:13-cv-10386-GM (twdb) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
bankruptcy
Notice Re: Bankruptcy Record Complete (CV-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/28 8:46 AM
NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 4/26/2023. (twdb) |
|
8 | 8
appeal
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability
Tue 03/28 8:38 AM
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability / CERTIFICATE OF READINESS AND COMPLETION OF RECORD ON APPEAL RE Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court1 (twdb) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:17 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
bankruptcy
Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:15 PM
NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/20 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCES IN APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. (jtil) |
|
4 | 4
bankruptcy
Election to Transfer Appeal To District Court (election)
Mon 03/20 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF ELECTION TO HAVE APPEAL HEARD filed by Appellee Landau Law LLP electing to transfer the Appeal to the District Court. (jtil) |
|
3 | 3
bankruptcy
Election to Transfer Appeal To District Court (statement)
Mon 03/20 1:04 PM
OPTIONAL APPELLEE STATEMENT OF ELECTION TO Proceed in District Court filed by Appellee David K. Gottlieb. (jtil) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/20 1:00 PM
NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT. (jtil) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment
Mon 03/20 12:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL: filed by Appellant Shirley Foose McClure Re: Order Granting Motion to Abandon the Real Property at 501 S. Hewitt No. 102, Los Angeles, CA entered on 1/25/2023 by Bankruptcy Judge Geraldine Mund, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 2/2/2023. Bankruptcy Court case number: 1:13-bk-10386, Adversary number: None, BAP case number: 23-1023 (jtil) |
|
Att: 1 Docket |