Everett Lee Cox v. Pfiffer
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02018 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Thu 12/14 8:18 AM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-4113 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,17 as to petitioner Everett Lee Cox. (mat) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
appeal
Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals
Wed 12/06 8:12 AM
[NOTICE OF APPEAL] to the 9th CCA ASKING THE COURT TO AUTHORIZE THE DISTRICT COURT TO CONSIDER APPELLANT/PETITIONERS CURRENT HABEAS PETITION, filed by petitioner Everett Lee Cox. Appeal of Order Dismissing Case,15 Filed On: 9/19/23; Entered On: 9/20/23; Certificate of Appealability ruled on 9/19/23, see item 16. (mat) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
order
Certificate of Appealability - Order of USDC
Wed 09/20 11:57 AM
ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)1 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
15 | 15
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 09/20 11:55 AM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court does not have jurisdiction to consider Petitioner's claims. The action is DISMISSED without prejudice as successive. (see document for further details) Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (hr) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
5
pgs
motion
Order
Fri 09/15 10:15 AM
REQUEST for this Federal District Court to Not Dismiss His Habeas Corpus Petition filed by Petitioner Everett Lee Cox. (hr) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Motion Hearing and R&R Deadlines
Fri 08/11 12:28 PM
ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS / STRATTON NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner: The Attorney General filed a motion to dismiss this habeas action. (Docket No. [ 11].)Petitioner's response to the motion will be due by or before September 14. Pursuant to the Local Rules of Court, Petitioner's response may not exceed 15 pages (excluding tables and exhibits). (see document for details). (et) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Lodging
Thu 08/10 2:59 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities 11(Byrne, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 LD1_Opinion, | ||
Att: 2 LD2_Pet. for Rev., | ||
Att: 3 LD3_Order Denying Pet., | ||
Att: 4 LD4_Order Denying Cert., | ||
Att: 5 LD5_Pet. for Writ, | ||
Att: 6 LD6_Order Denying Pet., | ||
Att: 7 LD7_Pet. for Writ | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Thu 08/10 2:51 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Respondent Pfiffer. (Byrne, Kenneth) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/06 1:24 PM
ORDER RE: RESPONSE TO HABEAS PETITION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, re Memorandum9 . The Court directs the Attorney General to respond to the petition and Petitioner's supplemental statement by answer or motion by August 18. Petitioner's submission in response to the state's filing will be due 30 days after that. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
11
pgs
misc
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Thu 06/22 11:12 AM
MEMORANDUM filed by Petitioner Everett Lee Cox. (hr) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
attorney
Attorney Appearance or Reassignment for the California Attorney General
Thu 05/18 12:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of California Attorney General Office Kenneth C. Byrne on behalf of Respondent Pfiffer. (Attorney Kenneth C Byrne added to party Pfiffer(pty:res))(Byrne, Kenneth) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/08 3:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE: SCREENING OF HABEAS PETITION by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Pursuant to the rules governing federal habeas actions, the Court conducted a preliminary review of Petitioner's habeas filing. Petitioner is ordered to show cause why this action should not be dismissed for a variety of procedural reasons outlined below. It is therefore ORDERED that Petitioner will file a memorandum by or before June 16, 2023, not to exceed 5 pages showing good cause why the case should not be dismissed. Alternatively, if Petitioner acknowledges that he is not entitled to further federal review of his conviction or sentence, he may voluntarily dismiss the action without consequence. See minute order for details. (lom) |
|
Att: 1 Part 1 | ||
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Financial Entry
Wed 04/19 10:10 AM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $5.00 from Everett Lee Cox. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)1 . Receipt number #1408. (jo) |
|
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/24 9:24 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (HABEAS)3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Ruling on the Request is POSTPONED for 30 days so that Petitioner may provide additional information. See order for specifics. (lom) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 9:21 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (sh) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 03/20 9:20 AM
REQUEST for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner Everett Lee Cox. (sh) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate - DECLINED by Party
Mon 03/20 9:18 AM
ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Everett Lee Cox. The Petitioner does not consent. (sh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Mon 03/20 9:15 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner.(Filing fee $ 5 FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Everett Lee Cox. (sh) |