Joseph Nichols v. Pfeiffer
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02054 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
order
Appoint Counsel
Mon 03/18 3:41 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: denying30 REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel. Petitioner's Request is denied without prejudice at this time. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
order
Extension of Time to File
Thu 03/14 2:21 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) RE CONSOLIDATION AND DIRECTION HENCEFORTH TO FILE DOCUMENTS IN ONLY LOWEST NUMBERED CASE; (2) STRIKING REQUESTS FILED BY PETITIONER IN TWO HIGHER NUMBERED CASES; (3) GRANTING IN PART PETITIONER'S EXTENSION REQUEST; AND (4) SUA SPONTE EXTENDING RESPONDENT'S DEADLINE TO FILE RESPONSE TO OPERATIVE FIRST AMENDED PETITION by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting in part27 REQUEST for Extension of Time. The extension requests filed in the 2922 Case and the 10923 Case - 2922 Case Docket No. 21 and 10923 Case Docket No. 8 - are ordered stricken. Petitioner shall not file any more documents in the 2922 Case or the 10923 Case. Any documents he wishes to file relating to these matters, must be filed only in the 2054 Case. This Court extends Plaintiff's deadline to file the notice called for by the District Judge's February 15, 2024 Order to April 11, 2024. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Appointment of Counsel
Thu 03/14 5:06 PM
REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel filed by Petitioner Joseph Nichols. (hr) |
|
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
order
Extension of Time to File
Mon 03/11 9:45 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting26 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Request is GRANTED and that Respondent is granted to April 15, 2024 to file a response to the First Amended Petition. (et) |
|
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 03/08 3:45 PM
First REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Response to first amended petition, declaration of counsel filed by Respondent Christian Pfeiffer. (Ladner, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 03/11 9:18 AM
REQUEST for Extension of Time and Declaration in Support filed by Petitioner Joseph Nichols. (et) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
11
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 02/20 10:56 AM
ORDER (1) CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS; (2) CONSTRUING PETITIONER'S SUBMISSIONS AS MOTIONS TO AMEND AND GRANTING MOTIONS; (3) DIRECTING CLERK TO FILE FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS IN FIRST ACTION; (4) DENYING SPECIFIED MOTIONS WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT; AND (5) SETTING DEADLINES by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Clerk shall administratively close the 2922 and 10923 Cases. Henceforth, the parties shall file any documents regarding these matters in the 2054 Case. Petitioner, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order, shall file a notice identifying any claims from the 2054 Petition or 2922 Petition that he believes are not included in the First Amended Petition (the 10923 Petition). Absent further Order of the Court, Respondent shall file a response to the First Amended Petition within thirty (30) days. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
Thursday, November 23, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
othcmp
Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Tue 02/20 11:31 AM
FIRST AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against Respondent Christian Pfeiffer, amending Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus1 , filed by Petitioner Joseph Nichols(hr) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Declaration
Thu 06/29 1:23 PM
EX PARTE DECLARATION of Joseph Nichols filed by Petitioner Joseph Nichols. (hr) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Supplement
Thu 06/22 4:28 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING filed by Petitioner Joseph Nichols.(hr) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/22 4:17 PM
NOTICE of Clarification filed by Petitioner Joseph Nichols. (hr) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Extension of Time to File
Wed 05/31 9:34 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER VACATING DATE AND DENYING AS MOOT RESPONDENT'S REVISED SECOND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: vacating and denying as moot13 REQUEST for Extension of Time. (see document for details) (hr) |
|
19 | 19
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 05/31 9:31 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO CLARIFY (1) WHETHER THE SECOND PETITION WAS INTENDED TO AMEND/SUPERSEDE THE FIRST PETITION; AND (2) WHICH JUDGMENT(S) HE IS CHALLENGING IN EACH CLAIM by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. As it is unclear from the above whether the Second Petition was intended to amend/supersede the First Petition and which judgment(s) Petitioner intends to challenge in each of his claims, Petitioner, by not later than June 29, 2023, is ordered to file a brief and concise "Notice of Clarification," which is no more than three pages in length and has no attachments (other than a proof of service), clarifying matters as directed below. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
18 | 18
order
Return of Property
Tue 05/30 4:39 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN PETITIONER'S "ANSWERS TO THE AC'S REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION EXHIBIT A" (DOCKET NOS. 15, 16); AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART AS MOOT PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR RETURN OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting in part and denying in part17 REQUEST for Document to be Returned. First, the Court directs the Clerk to strike the Answers from the record and return the hard copies to Petitioner. Although the Attorney General filed a Request for Clarification in a related case (Case No. 2:23-cv-02922-DSF-JC) - asking that the Court, not petitioner clarify a matter - the Attorney General did not file such a request in the instant action. Accordingly, petitioner's filing of the Answers herein is uncalled for, unauthorized, and creates confusion in the record. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Return of Property
Tue 05/30 3:53 PM
REQUEST for Document to be returned filed by Petitioner Joseph Nichols. (klg) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/26 10:14 AM
ANSWER to the AG's Request for Clarification Exhibit A filed by Petitioner Joseph Nichols.(hr) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 05/26 10:09 AM
ANSWER to the AG's Request for Clarification Exhibit A filed by Petitioner Joseph Nichols.(hr) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
Thu 05/18 12:55 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Extension of Time to File12 filed by respondent Pfeiffer. (Ladner, Nancy) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 05/16 4:39 PM
Second REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition filed by respondent Pfeiffer. (Ladner, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 05/16 10:11 AM
Second REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition filed by respondent Pfeiffer. (Ladner, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Declaration
Fri 05/12 9:03 AM
DECLARATION of Joseph Nichols filed by Petitioner Joseph Nichols. (hr) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Extension of Time to File
Tue 04/18 9:08 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian: granting9 REQUEST for Extension of Time to File. Respondent is granted to May 22, 2023 to file a response to the Petition. (hr) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Mon 04/17 11:42 AM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Response to Petition filed by respondent Pfeiffer. (Ladner, Nancy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Appoint Counsel
Thu 04/13 7:37 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (DKT. NO. 7) by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian.The Court is in receipt of Petitioner's Request for Appointment of Counsel ("Petitioner's Request"). Petitioner's Request is denied without prejudice at this time. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (ch) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appointment of Counsel
Tue 04/11 8:25 AM
REQUEST for Appointment of Counsel filed by petitioner Joseph Nichols. (ch) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Appearance
Thu 03/30 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Nancy Lii Ladner on behalf of Respondent Pfeiffer (Attorney Nancy Lii Ladner added to party Pfeiffer(pty:res))(Ladner, Nancy) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Tue 03/21 4:26 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REGARDING REQUIREMENTS FOR PREPARATION AND SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (see document for details) (hr) |
|
4 | 4
4
pgs
order
Order Requiring Return/Answer to Petition
Tue 03/21 4:24 PM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS INVOLVING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS BY A PERSON IN STATE CUSTODY by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Within fourteen (14) days, respondent shall file and serve a notice of appearance (see document for further details). Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the California Attorney Generals Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (hr) |
|
Att: 1 Petition | ||
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form
Mon 03/20 1:41 PM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (ghap) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111)
Mon 03/20 1:41 PM
Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Habeas Corpus Petition (CV-111). Upon submission of your petition for writ of habeas corpus, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)1 . (ghap) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Mon 03/20 1:40 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Choolijian.(Filing fee $ 5: FEE DUE.), filed by petitioner Joseph Nichols. (ghap) |