Anthony Amirikhass v. Walmart Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-02088 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 20, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court of Los Angeles, 23STCV02897 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:39 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brad Hodsdon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Associates Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Amirikhass
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
judgmentCV
Judgment
Fri 02/16 9:43 AM
JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ADJUDGED that the above-captioned case is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv) |
|
32 | 32
order
Dismissing Case
Fri 02/16 9:40 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal31 shall be construed as plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss the operative complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). Plaintiff's Motion so construed is granted. (iv) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 02/13 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Anthony Amirikhass. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Carr, Michael) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Mon 02/12 8:56 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal29 . The following error(s) was/were found: Defendants have filed an Answer to the complaint, therefore rule 41(a) is not applicable. A proposed order for the Court's review is needed. If counsel does not correct this deficiency within two business days, the court may strike the document. (iv) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Fri 02/09 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Defendant Walmart Associates Inc.. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Hansen, Tiffany) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
order
Protective Order
Mon 12/11 9:28 AM
ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner re Notice of Lodging Agreed Confidentiality Order26 . The Court accepts and ENTERS the proposed order subject to the following: (see document for details). The parties failed to provide the Court with an adequate statement of good cause regarding the litigation. The entry of this order is contingent on the filing of such a statement within five court days. (hr) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
attorney
Change of Address
Thu 12/07 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Valerie Consolacion Leones attorney for Plaintiff Anthony Amirikhass. Changing firm name to Leones Law Firm and address to 490 Chadbourne Road, Suite A153, Fairfield, CA 94534. Filed by Plaintiff Anthony Amirikhass. (Leones, Valerie) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Lodging
Wed 12/06 7:48 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan11(Yudelson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order | ||
25 | 25
adr
Mediation Report (ADR-3) Unable to Reach Agreement
Wed 12/06 5:02 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Plaintiff Anthony Amirikhass : Mediation held on December 4, 2023. The parties are unable to reach an agreement at this time. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Carr, Michael) |
|
Sunday, November 26, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Sun 11/26 11:29 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict; re party. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Sun 11/26 11:26 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Docket text and document conflict; re party. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 11/22 1:39 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Valerie Consolacion Leones counsel for Plaintiff Anthony Amirikhass. Valerie Consolacion Leones is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Counsel for Plaintiff Anthony Amirikhass. (Leones, Valerie) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 11/21 5:26 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David A. Yudelson counsel for Defendants Does, Brad Hodsdon, Walmart Associates Inc., Walmart Inc.. Filed by Defendant Walmart, Inc., Walmart Associates, Inc., Brad Hodson, Does 1 through 100. (Yudelson, David) |
|
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/21 12:04 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION19 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Order to Show Cause18 is hereby discharged. *See order for continued deadlines.* (vdr) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Continue
Mon 11/20 7:16 PM
STIPULATION to Continue Discovery and Settlement-Related Deadlines filed by Defendant Walmart Associates Inc., Walmart Inc..(Yudelson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 11/20 12:44 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 11/29/2023. (vdr) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/12 11:31 AM
ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING14 16 Non-Resident Attorney Nicole D. Espin APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Brad Hodsdon, Walmart Associates Inc. and Walmart Inc., designating David A. Yudelson as local counsel. (lt) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 09/07 10:20 AM
Corrected APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole D. Espin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Does, Brad Hodsdon, Walmart Associates Inc., Walmart Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 8/29/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-35946297) filed by defendant Does, Brad Hodsdon, Walmart Associates Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Yudelson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form
Wed 08/30 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole D. Espin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Does, Brad Hodsdon, Walmart Associates Inc., Walmart Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35946297)14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 3/21/23, Dkt. 6. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Tue 08/29 12:37 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicole D. Espin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Does, Brad Hodsdon, Walmart Associates Inc., Walmart Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-35946297) filed by defendant Does, Brad Hodsdon, Walmart Associates Inc., Walmart Inc.. (Attorney David A Yudelson added to party Does(pty:dft)) (Yudelson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice | ||
Thursday, May 04, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 05/04 1:25 PM
ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) |
|
12 | 12
19
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 05/04 1:23 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 5/21/2024 at 9:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (gga) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 04/27 1:51 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Plaintiff Anthony Amirikhass.. (Leones, Valerie) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Thu 03/30 2:08 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/27/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (gga) |
|
Wednesday, March 29, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 03/29 1:22 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (gga) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/21 1:23 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 1:22 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/21 1:22 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Tue 03/21 12:15 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendants BRAD HODSDON, WALMART ASSOCIATES, INC., WALMART, INC., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Corporate Disclosure Statement4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on March 21, 2023. (Yudelson, David) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 03/20 7:00 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants BRAD HODSDON, WALMART ASSOCIATES, INC., WALMART, INC. identifying Walmart, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Yudelson, David) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 03/20 6:58 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants BRAD HODSDON, WALMART ASSOCIATES, INC., WALMART, INC., identifying Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., John "Brad" Hodsden, and Anthony Amirikhass. (Yudelson, David) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 03/20 6:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants BRAD HODSDON, WALMART ASSOCIATES, INC., WALMART, INC.. (Yudelson, David) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 03/20 6:47 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Los Angeles, case number 23STCV02897 Receipt No: ACACDC-34989974 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants BRAD HODSDON, WALMART ASSOCIATES, INC., WALMART, INC.. (Attorney David A Yudelson added to party BRAD HODSDON(pty:dft), Attorney David A Yudelson added to party WALMART ASSOCIATES, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney David A Yudelson added to party WALMART, INC.(pty:dft))(Yudelson, David) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration John "Brad" Hodsden, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration David A. Yudelson, | ||
Att: 3 31 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit M | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 1:10 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Brad Hodsdon, Walmart Associates Inc., Walmart Inc., filed by Plaintiff Anthony Amirikhass[FILED IN STATE COURT 02/09/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Tue 03/21 1:13 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Anthony Amirikhass, upon Defendant Walmart Inc. served on 2/16/2023. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT 02/17/2023 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 8 EXHIBIT F TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Tue 03/21 1:16 PM
NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Brad Hodsdon, Walmart Associates Inc., Walmart Inc.[STATE COURT FILE DATE NOT INDICATED SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 9 EXHIBIT G TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ](sh) |