Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:22-bk-51153

Mississippi Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Katharine M Samson
Case #: 6:23-ap-06006
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
Case Filed:Mar 21, 2023
Terminated:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
George Ryan Campbell
36 Fluer De Lis
Hattiesburg, MS 39402
Represented By
George Ryan Campbell
contact info
Plaintiff
Adam Pittman
84 Cherry Laurel Loops
Hattiesburg, MS 39402
Represented By
George Adam Sanford
Mcraney & Mcraney
contact info
Trustee
Derek A Henderson T1
1765-A Lelia Drive Suite 103
Jackson, MS 39216
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
501 East Court Street Suite 6-430
Jackson, MS 39201


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, August 01, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 08/01 8:40 AM
Adversary Case 6:23-ap-6006 Closed (mcc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Wed 07/17 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 07/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Monday, July 15, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 07/15 3:47 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding . (mcc)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
15 15 2 pgs notice Notice of Status Conference Mon 07/01 10:14 AM
Notice of Status Conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 7/25/2024 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom - Hattiesburg. (mcc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Adam Pittman
Friday, December 15, 2023
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Fri 12/15 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
13 13 order Withdraw As Attorney Wed 12/13 2:53 PM
Order Withdrawing Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Related [+] (Cannette, Christy)
Related: [-] 10
Saturday, November 11, 2023
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Hearing (Adversary) Sun 11/12 10:44 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Hearing. Related [+] Notice Date 11/11/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Hearing Set - Adversary
Thursday, November 09, 2023
11 11 court Hearing Set (KMS) Adversary Thu 11/09 8:27 AM
Notice of Hearing. Related [+] Hearing to be held on 12/14/2023 at 09:30 AM Courtroom - Hattiesburg for10 , Responses due by 12/7/2023. (Cannette, Christy)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant George Ryan Campbell
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
10 10 motion Withdraw As Attorney Wed 11/08 4:26 PM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Defendant George Ryan Campbell (Ferraez, Cory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Generic Motion Tue 06/06 10:49 AM
Agreed Order Granting Motion to Hold Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance Related [+] (Cannette, Christy)
Related: [-] 7
Monday, June 05, 2023
8 8 2 pgs court Hearing Set (KMS) Adversary Mon 06/05 10:45 AM
Notice of Hearing. Related [+] Hearing to be held on 7/13/2023 at 09:30 AM Courtroom - Hattiesburg for7 , Responses due by 7/6/2023. (Cannette, Christy)
Related: [-] 7 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Adam Pittman
Sunday, June 04, 2023
7 7 4 pgs motion Generic Motion Sun 06/04 9:24 PM
Motion to Hold Adversary Proceeding in Abeyance Filed by Plaintiff Adam Pittman (Sanford, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Scheduling Order Thu 06/01 11:37 AM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Discovery due by 8/30/2023. (Cannette, Christy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Adam Pittman
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
5 5 5 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 05/23 11:59 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by George Ryan Campbell. (Ferraez, Cory)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
4 4 2 pgs misc Document Mon 03/27 4:32 PM
Document Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons Filed by Defendant George Ryan Campbell. (Ferraez, Cory)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
3 3 2 pgs court Summons Issued Tue 03/21 1:17 PM
Summons Issued on George Ryan Campbell Date Issued 3/21/2023, Answer Due 4/20/2023 (Cannette, Christy)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 03/21 11:58 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-06006 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14406226. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 2 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/21 11:57 AM
Adversary case 23-06006 (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint by George Adam Sanford on behalf of Adam Pittman against George Ryan Campbell. Fee Amount $350 (Sanford, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Complaint
Att: 2 12 pgs Exhibit