Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steven D Grimberg
Case #: 1:23-cv-01211
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 22, 2023
Terminated:Nov 13, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 4:52 AM EDT
Defendant
Eaglin Dental Group
Plaintiff
Fe'Anah Bent Maryam
651 Robert St. NW
Atlanta, GA 30318


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
8 8 misc Judgment - Clerk Wed 11/13 1:43 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing action without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e). (tcc)
Related: [-]
7 7 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous Wed 11/13 12:32 PM
ORDER: The Court finds that Plaintiff's complaint [ECF3 ] is subject to dismissal under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e) and ORDERS that the complaint be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 11/13/2024. (tcc)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Wed 11/13 9:48 AM
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: Docket reviewed; no conflicts identified. Approved by Judge Grimberg. (dnb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 11/13 1:11 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (tcc)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/14 12:58 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Fe'Anah Bent Maryam re8 Clerk's Judgment,7 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous. (tcc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/06 2:57 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Fe'Anah Bent Maryam re5 Order. (lwb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
5 5 30+ pgs order Order Thu 07/06 2:53 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on July 5, 2023. (lwb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Filing Tue 05/23 11:35 AM
NOTICE Of Filing Judicial Intervention by Fe'Anah Bent Maryam (tht)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 03/28 9:45 AM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Fe'Anah Bent Maryam re2 Order. (bgt)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Tue 03/28 9:48 AM
Submission of3 Complaint for frivolity determination, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
3 3 cmp Complaint Tue 03/28 9:47 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Fe'Anah Bent Maryam.(bgt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 2 pgs order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/28 9:44 AM
ORDER granting1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 3/27/2023. (bgt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Thu 03/23 9:53 AM
Submission of1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (ceo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
1 1 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 03/23 9:52 AM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Fe'Anah Bent Maryam.(ceo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet