Griffin et al v. Amerada Petroleum Corp
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Carol B Whitehurst |
Referred: | Patrick J Hanna |
Case #: | 6:14-cv-02998 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 4:39 PM CDT |
Defendant
Amerada Petroleum Corp
|
|
Defendant
Hess Corp
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amerada Hess Corp
|
|
Defendant
Exxon Mobil Corp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Griffin
106 Santa Marie Dr
Opelousas, LA 70570 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorothy Joachain
1310 Jennings Rd
Opelousas, LA 70570 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Amerada Hess Petroleum Corp
Terminated: 01/26/2015
|
|
Defendant
Exxon Mobile Production Co
Terminated: 02/12/2015
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
94 | 94
appeal
Appeal Remark
Wed 04/04 7:20 AM
APPEAL REMARK re80 Notice of Appeal: Supreme Court Order received denying petition for writ of certiorari filed by Appellants Mr. Anthony Griffin and Ms. Dorothy Joachain. (USCA 17-30165 (crt,WalkerSld, B) |