Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.196.238.185
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Wiley Y Daniel |
Referred: | Michael E Hegarty |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-02776 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2014 |
Terminated: | Nov 26, 2014 |
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 2:00 AM MDT |
Plaintiff
Malibu Media, LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.196.238.185
Terminated: 11/26/2014
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, December 12, 2014 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Report re: Patent/Trademark/Copyright
Fri 12/12 2:03 PM
REPORT on the determination of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights (evana, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 26, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the12 notice of Settlement and Voluntary Dismissal filed in this case on 11/26/2014, and Party John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.196.238.185 terminated. Text Only Entry (evana, ) | |
12 | 12 NOTICE of Settlement and Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.196.238.185 by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC (Kotzker, Jason) | |
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC (Kotzker, Jason) | |
Tuesday, October 14, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part8 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/14/2014.(evana, ) | |
9 | 9 MEMORANDUM regarding8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Malibu Media, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/14/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec) | |
Monday, October 13, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Plaintiff Malibu Media, LLC.(Kotzker, Jason) | |
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
7 | 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kotzker, Jason) | |
Friday, October 10, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 MINUTE ORDER This case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to an Order Referring Case entered by Senior Judge Wiley Y. Daniel. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a status report on the tenth day of each month informing the Court of the status of service in this case. For its monthly reports, Plaintiff need not file a separate report in each case, but may include this case in one monthly report of associated cases; however, Plaintiff shall separately notify the Court in which case the monthly status report is filed. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/10/2014. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, ) | |
5 | 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for dispositive matters. That pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge is designated to conduct proceedings in this civil action as follows: (1) Convene a scheduling conference under Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2. (2) Conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause. (3) Hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. (4) Conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. (5) Alternative Dispute Resolution Authority: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge, or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. (6) Conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. It is further ORDERED that parties and counsel shall be familiar and comply with the above judge's requirements found at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Entered by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/10/14. Text Only Entry (rkeec) | |
4 | 4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Local Rule. (jofox ) | |
3 | 3 REPORT on the filing of an action mailed to Register of Copyrights. (jofox ) | |
2 | 2 Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jofox ) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 71.196.238.185 (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4086697)Attorney Jason Aaron Kotzker added to party Malibu Media, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Malibu Media, LLC.(Kotzker, Jason) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |