The Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | William J Lafferty |
Case #: | 4:23-bk-40523 |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2023 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 12, 2023 |
Claims Deadline: | Sep 11, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
The Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland
2121 Harrison Street Suite 100
Oakland, CA 94612 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Not Assigned - OK
|
|
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102 |
1. | Diocese of Oakland files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (eastbaytimes.com) |
Submitted Tue 05/09/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago |
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
1109 | 1109
order
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/02 10:43 AM
Supplemental Order Increasing The Monthly Caps Authorized Under the Court's Prior Order (I) Authorizing the Retention and Payment, Effective as of the Petition Date, of Professionals Utilized by the Debtor in the Ordinary Course of Business and (II) Granting Related Relie (rba) |
|
1108 | 1108
order
Stay Pending Appeal
Thu 05/02 10:40 AM
Order Granting LMI's Motion For Stay Pending Appeal of Order Granting the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' ex Parte Application for Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 Examination of Insurers (rba) |
|
court
Transcript Record Transmittal
Thu 05/02 4:06 PM
Transcript Record Transmittal (Court transcript records have been uploaded) for Order Number: 23-40523 1093-1095 Regarding Hearing Date: 4/26/2024. Transcription Service Provider: e-Scribers, Contact Information: sales@escribers.net . (pw) |
||
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
1107 | 1107
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 05/01 3:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Timothy W. Evanston. Filed by Interested Party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Slip Nos. CU 1001, K66034, K78138 and CU 3061 (Evanston, Timothy) |
|
Tuesday, April 30, 2024 | ||
1106 | 1106
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 04/30 2:57 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland (Albert, Gabrielle) |
|
1105 | 1105
misc
Statement
Tue 04/30 2:47 PM
Statement of Monthly Fees and Expenses of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC for March 1, 2024 through March 31, 2024 . Filed by Debtor The Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland (Moses, Shane) |
|
1104 | 1104
misc
Statement
Tue 04/30 2:46 PM
Statement of Monthly Fees and Expenses of Foley & Lardner LLP for March 1, 2024 through March 31, 2024 . Filed by Debtor The Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland (Moses, Shane) |
|
1103 | 1103
misc
Statement
Tue 04/30 1:14 PM
Statement of Burns Bair LLP Monthly Professional Fees for the Period of March 1, 2024 through March 31, 2024 Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland (Albert, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
1102 | 1102
misc
Statement
Tue 04/30 1:08 PM
Statement of Certificate of Compliance With Order (I) Authorizing the Retention and Payment, Effective as of the Petition Date, of Professionals Utilized by the Debtor in the Ordinary Course of Business; and (II) Granting Related Relief, for the Quarter Ended March 31, 2024 . Filed by Debtor The Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland (Moses, Shane) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
1101 | 1101
misc
Statement
Mon 04/29 4:57 PM
Statement of Monthly Fees and Expenses of Berkeley Research Group, LLC for March 1, 2024 through March 31, 2024 . Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland (Albert, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
1100 | 1100
notice
Notice
Mon 04/29 4:26 PM
Notice Regarding Revised Proposed Form of Order on United States Trustees Motion for Order Appointing Fee Examiner . Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak (Blumberg, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Ex. A Revised Form of Proposed Order | ||
Att: 2 Ex. B Blackline | ||
1099 | 1099
misc
Statement
Mon 04/29 3:52 PM
Statement of Monthly Fees and Expenses of Lowenstein Sandler LLP for March 1, 2024 through March 31, 2024 . Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland (Albert, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
1098 | 1098
misc
Statement
Mon 04/29 3:50 PM
Statement of Monthly Fees of Stout Risius Ross, LLP for March 1, 2024 through March 31, 2024 . Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland (Albert, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
1097 | 1097
misc
Statement
Mon 04/29 3:42 PM
Statement of SEVENTH MONTHLY FEE STATEMENT OF BREALL & BREALL, LLP, AS SPECIAL INSURANCE COUNSEL TO THE DEBTOR, FOR ALLOWANCE AND PAYMENT OF COMPENSATION AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES FOR THE PERIOD OF MARCH 1, 2024 THROUGH MARCH 31, 2024 Filed by Spec. Counsel Joseph M. Breall (Breall, Joseph) |
|
1096 | 1096
misc
Statement
Mon 04/29 3:13 PM
Statement of Monthly Fees and Expenses of Keller Benvenutti Kim LLP [March 1, 2024 through March 31, 2024] . Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland (Albert, Gabrielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
1095 | 1095
misc
Transcript Order Form (Public Request)
Mon 04/29 10:02 AM
Transcript Order Form regarding Hearing Date 4/26/2024 Filed by Creditor Westport Insurance Corporation (Curet, Blaise) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
1094 | 1094
audio
audio
Fri 04/26 10:30 PM
The Audio File attached to the PDF includes several hearings. Court Date & Time [ 4/26/2024 10:00:01 AM ]. File Size [ 69327 KB ]. Run Time [ 04:48:52 ]. (admin) |
|
1093 | 1093
misc
Transcript Order Form (Public Request)
Fri 04/26 10:07 AM
Transcript Order Form regarding Hearing Date 4/26/2024 . Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Roman Catholic Bishop of Oakland (Albert, Gabrielle) |
|
court
Hearing Held (Bk)
Fri 04/26 4:27 PM
Hearing Held. Minutes of Proceeding: For reasons stated on the record, the Motion to Stay is approved on an interim basis for 2 weeks while the Court considers the pending issues discussed during the hearing. Order to be submitted. . (cf) |
||
court
Hearing Held (Bk)
Fri 04/26 4:31 PM
Hearing Held. Minutes of Proceeding: For reasons stated on the record with oral arguments made during the hearing, matters taken under submission. . (cf) |
||
court
Hearing Held (Bk)
Fri 04/26 4:36 PM
Hearing Held. Minutes of Proceeding: For reasons stated on the record, the Motion for a Supplemental Order is approved with the order to be submitted to include the updates as discussed on the record. . (cf) |
||
Thursday, April 25, 2024 | ||
1092 | 1092
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/25 6:01 PM
Certificate of Service of Rossmery Martinez re: Third Order Extending Exclusive Periods for the Debtor to File and Solicit Acceptance of a Chapter 11 Plan Filed by Other Prof. Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC . (Gershbein, Evan) |
|
1091 | 1091
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 04/25 2:42 PM
Certificate of Service of Ronaldo Lizarraga Angulo re: Documents Served on April 22, 2024 Filed by Other Prof. Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC . (Gershbein, Evan) |
|
1090 | 1090
3
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/25 2:10 PM
Memorandum Regarding the Hearings on Various Motions on April 26, 2024 . (cf) |
|
1089 | 1089
court
Transcript
Thu 04/25 5:56 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/23/2024 RE: Status Conference. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber, 800-257-0885. . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/2/2024. Redaction Request Due By 05/16/2024. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 05/28/2024. Transcript access will be restricted through 07/24/2024. (Gottlieb, Jason) |