Jakob Express, LLC
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Christopher G Bradley |
Case #: | 3:23-bk-30493 |
Case Filed: | May 12, 2023 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 26, 2023 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 09, 2023 |
Debtor
Jakob Express, LLC
12186 Rathmore Drive
El Paso, TX 79928 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Ronald E Ingalls
PO Box 2867
Fredericksburg, TX 78624 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/03/2023 10:15 AM CDT |
Friday, May 12, 2023 | ||
crditcrd
ICC-Fee Paid
Fri 05/12 7:29 PM
ICC-Fee Terminated for Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 23-30493 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00), Amount $ 338.00, Receipt A23657231 (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
59
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition Chapter 7
Fri 05/12 7:21 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) With Schedules, With Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Jakob Express, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 05/19/2023 (Haugland, Corey) |
|
2 | 2
court
Chapter 7AB Auto Assignment
Fri 05/12 7:22 PM
|
|
3 | 3
misc
Declaration for Electronic Filing (Restricted Document)
Fri 05/12 7:28 PM
Declaration for Electronic Filing filed by Corey Haugland for Debtor Jakob Express, LLC. (Haugland, Corey) |