Ross v. The Independent Order of Foresters
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jamar K Walker |
Referred: | Douglas E Miller |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-00064 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1446 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court for the City of Hampton, CL22-2842 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2023 6:04 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
The Independent Order of Foresters
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Amber Dawn Ross
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Independent Order of Foresters
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amber Dawn Ross
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 03/13 1:43 PM
ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the claims and demands thatPlaintiff Amber Dawn Ross brought against Defendant The Independent Order of Foresters are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and the claims and demands thatDefendant The Independent Order of Foresters brought against Plaintiff AmberDawn Ross are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 5/13/2024. (dbra, ) |
|
30 | 30
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 03/13 8:57 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Amber Dawn Ross. (Ryan, John) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
notice
Notice (other)
Fri 03/01 11:21 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - The court has been advised that this matter is settled. At the direction of the court, we must notify you that the matter will be dismissed with prejudice unless an otherwise appropriate dismissal order is submitted by counsel within eleven (11) days from the date of this notice. This deadline may be extended only by an order of court obtained by counsel. If this matter requires court approval of the settlement, you should arrange an appropriate date for a hearing on settlement approval with the assigned judges calendar clerk. The court appreciates your giving this matter your prompt attention. (dbra, ) |
||
Tuesday, February 13, 2024 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Wed 02/14 7:57 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller:Settlement Conference held on 2/13/2024. (cdod, ) |
||
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 02/12 5:11 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying12 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim. Plaintiff Amber Dawn Ross is required to file an answer to the counterclaim within 14 days of entry of this Memorandum Order. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 2/12/2024. (dbra, ) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
respoth
Brief in Support
Thu 02/01 3:28 PM
Brief in Support to27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Independent Order of Foresters.(Hodge, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit R | ||
27 | 27
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 02/01 3:13 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Independent Order of Foresters. (Hodge, Jason) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
3
pgs
order
Order
Fri 01/19 12:07 PM
Settlement Conference Order: Settlement conference is scheduled for 1:30 p.m. on February 13, 2024; memorandums are due by 12:00 noon on February 9, 2024. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 1/19/2024. (dbra, ) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 01/19 9:39 AM
Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 2/13/2024 at 01:30 PM in Newport News Judges Chamber before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (cdod, ) |
||
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
order
Protective Order
Tue 11/21 9:44 AM
Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 11/20/2023. (dbra, ) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Protective Order
Mon 11/20 5:17 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by The Independent Order of Foresters.(Hodge, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order) | ||
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
6
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Thu 11/16 4:14 PM
Scheduling Order - It is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2024 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk before District Judge Jamar K. Walker. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Newport News 1 before District Judge Jamar K. Walker. The parties are ORDERED to schedule a settlement conference to take place not later than one week before the final pretrial conference. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 11/16/23. (ptom, ) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 10/03 10:46 AM
ORDER granting21 Amended Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 10/3/2023. (Walker, Jamar) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/02 12:13 PM
Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Douglas Patterson and Certification of Local Counsel Jason R. Hodge by The Independent Order of Foresters. (Hodge, Jason) |
|
misc
Notice of Correction
Mon 10/02 11:03 AM
Notice of Correction re20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Douglas Patterson and Certification of Local Counsel Jason R Hodge Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9149032. The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. The motion contains an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form. Local counsel should file a corrected motion that is saved as a PDF non-fillable form and that also includes the written signature of the applicant. Counsel should not pay a second fee. (Tlev, ) |
||
Friday, September 29, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/29 9:42 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Douglas Patterson and Certification of Local Counsel Jason R Hodge Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-9149032. by The Independent Order of Foresters. (Hodge, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
7
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Tue 08/15 3:23 PM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2024 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk. Jury Trial set for 3/19/2024 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk. The parties are ORDERED to schedule a settlement conference on or before the final pretrial conference. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 8/15/23 (nunc pro tunc: 8/8/23). (ptom, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2023 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference-Rule16b
Tue 08/08 10:33 AM
Scheduling Conference - Rule 16b held on 8/8/2023. (ptom, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 08/01 3:36 PM
Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference reset for 8/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk Remote. (ptom, ) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 07/24 4:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amber Dawn Ross. (Cales, James) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order
Thu 07/20 3:45 PM
RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Norfolk Remote. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 7/20/23. (bap, ) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 07/17 9:28 AM
ORDER: The Motion to Extend Deadlines for Filing Responsive Pleadings is GRANTED. The deadline for Ross' filing of any reply brief in support of the Motion to Dismiss is extended to July 24, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller and filed on 7/17/23. (epri, ) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 07/14 1:59 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Amber Dawn Ross.(Cales, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Fri 07/14 8:00 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Douglas E. Miller15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (dbra, ) |
||
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
16
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition
Thu 07/06 10:38 AM
Memorandum in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by The Independent Order of Foresters.(Hodge, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/15 1:52 PM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Jamar K. Walker. District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes no longer assigned to the case. (afar) |
||
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
7
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 06/14 9:23 AM
Memorandum in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Amber Dawn Ross. (Ryan, John) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 06/14 9:21 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amber Dawn Ross. (Ryan, John) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Wed 06/07 4:30 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Pro hac vice for D. Lawrence Kristinik, III as to The Independent Order of Foresters. Signed by District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes on 06/07/2023. (tlev, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/06 10:33 AM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by D. Lawrence Kristinik, III and Certification of Local Counsel Jason R. Hodge Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8968150. by The Independent Order of Foresters. (Hodge, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Tue 05/30 10:39 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to Counterclaim and Related Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 5/30/2023. (dbra, ) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 05/26 3:35 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re7 MOTION for Extension to Respond to Counterclaim, without objection, filed by The Independent Order of Foresters. (Hodge, Jason) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Extension of
Fri 05/26 10:06 AM
MOTION for Extension to Respond to Counterclaim, without objection, by Amber Dawn Ross.(Cales, James) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 05/22 10:21 AM
COPY OF ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint and Counterclaims by The Independent Order of Foresters.(dbra, ) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 05/19 2:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Independent Order of Foresters. (Hodge, Jason) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Citizenship Disclosure Form
Fri 05/19 12:14 PM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by The Independent Order of Foresters. (Hodge, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 05/19 12:07 PM
Civil Cover Sheet re1 Notice of Removal by The Independent Order of Foresters. (Hodge, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
utility
Mag Notice / Judge Information
Fri 05/19 11:45 AM
Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) |
|
1 | 1
7
pgs
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 05/19 11:30 AM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8944077.), filed by The Independent Order of Foresters.(Hodge, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 221 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 05/19 11:44 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Elizabeth W. Hanes and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) |