Widmaier v. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | Lindsey R Vaala |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00660 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury/ Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | May 19, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Circuit Court for Fairfax County, 23-06068 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 15, 2023 6:04 AM EST |
Defendant
Malek Medley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William R. Widmaier
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order 1 - Terminate Hearings
Thu 10/12 1:48 PM
ORDER re the parties' Joint10 Stipulation of Dismissal and Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice; and it is Further Ordered that the final pretrial conference scheduled for 10/19/2023 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/12/2023. (tarm) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 10/06 11:16 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by William R. Widmaier. (Perushek, Matthew) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/14 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Charles Perushek on behalf of William R. Widmaier (Perushek, Matthew) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Affidavit
Fri 07/14 11:10 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Process Server by Malek Medley, Tesla Energy Operations, Inc.. (Moriarty, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
5
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Wed 06/21 2:53 PM
Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that the Joint Discovery Plan is approved, as amended herein, and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court; and it is further ORDERED that the Rule 16(b) Conference scheduled for June 28, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 6/21/2023. (nneb) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Discovery Plan
Tue 06/13 1:54 PM
Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Malek Medley, Tesla Energy Operations, Inc..(Clegg, Bryn) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/01 3:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/19/2023 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. Discovery due by 10/13/2023. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 6/1/2023.(tarm, ) |
|
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form | ||
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Status Report
Wed 05/31 2:14 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Proposal Regarding the Timeline for Defendants' Response to the Complaint by Malek Medley, Tesla Energy Operations, Inc..(Moriarty, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
3 | 3
misc
Financial Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/31 11:21 AM
Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Tesla Energy Operations, Inc.. (Moriarty, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/24 2:59 PM
ORDERED that the parties submit a joint proposal regarding the timeline for Defendants' response to the Complaint and any corresponding briefing, if necessary. The parties must submit such report no later than May 31, 2023. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/24/2023. (swil) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 05/19 2:47 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8944616.), filed by Malek Medley, Tesla Energy Operations, Inc..(Moriarty, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Mon 05/22 9:49 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (swil) |