Williamson v. School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate) et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond A Jackson |
Referred: | Douglas E Miller |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00224 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race) |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:30 AM EST |
Defendant
Michael K. Lamonea
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brittany Nicole Walker
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Angela B. Swygert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kimberly A. Scott
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Norman Pool
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Suzan L. McDermott
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John M. McCormick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Laurie Edgar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amanda Grace Dean
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raymond Collins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Samuel L. Boone, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Michael Ross Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian T. Austin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Edward Williamson
2728 Millhouse Lane
Chesapeake, VA 23323 |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
4
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Tue 04/16 4:05 PM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference, the Court ORDERS as follows: Final Pretrial Conference to be conducted on 8/28/2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Norfolk. Jury Trial to commence on 9/10/2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Norfolk. The parties are ORDERED to schedule a settlement conference with the Magistrate Judge on or before the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 4/16/2024. (bap, ) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference-Rule16b
Fri 04/12 10:09 AM
Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held. (bap, ) |
||
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
order
Rule 26(f) Pretrial Order
Wed 03/20 3:06 PM
RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference to be conducted remotely on 4/12/2024 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 3/20/2024. (bap, ) |
|
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice (other)
Fri 03/15 11:33 AM
NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED FROM COMPLAINT DUE TO DEFICIENCIES IN DEFENDANTS' ANSWER, re29 by William Edward Williamson (epri, ) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
respm
Response to Motion
Thu 03/14 10:05 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re29 MOTION filed by Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker.(Harding, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Answer to Complaint | ||
Friday, March 08, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
respoth
Reply Other
Fri 03/08 4:18 PM
REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND ADDITIONAL STATEMENTS filed by William Edward Williamson. (epri, ) |
|
30 | 30
11
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 03/08 4:04 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED FROM COMPLAINT DUE TO DEFICIENCIES IN DEFENDANTS' ANSWER,29 filed by William Edward Williamson. (epri, ) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Fri 03/08 4:03 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED FROM COMPLAINT DUE TO DEFICIENCIES IN DEFENDANTS' ANSWER by William Edward Williamson. (epri, ) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 03/06 11:07 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker.(Harding, Andrew) |
|
misc
Refer for 16 b
Wed 03/06 12:23 PM
Referred for 16(b). (epri, ) |
||
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Wed 02/21 4:17 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Default, ECF No. 22, is DENIED; Plaintiff's Motion to Exceed Page Limit, ECF No. 17, is GRANTED; and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 15, is DENIED without prejudice to re-file another summary judgment motion upon completion of the discovery period. This Order docketed in the Court's electronic filing system as DIRECTED on 2.21.24. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson and filed on 2/21/24. (epri, ) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (other)
Fri 10/20 3:04 PM
NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT FOR MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS by William Edward Williamson (epri, ) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
respoth
Opposition
Wed 10/18 3:14 PM
Opposition to23 Memorandum in Support,22 Request for Entry of Default as to filed by Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker.(Harding, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument | ||
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Affidavit
Mon 10/16 3:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT by William Edward Williamson. (epri, ) |
|
23 | 23
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Mon 10/16 3:14 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS filed by William Edward Williamson.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Entry of Default
Mon 10/16 3:09 PM
PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANTS by William Edward Williamson. (epri, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Tue 08/22 2:35 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Roseboro,. filed by Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker. (Harding, Andrew) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 08/18 9:44 AM
MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by William Edward Williamson.(epri, ) (Main Document 20 replaced on 8/18/2023) (epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A Affidavit of William Edward Williamson, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 16, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 17, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit 18, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit 19, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit 20, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit 21, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit 22, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit 23, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit 24, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit 25, | ||
Att: 27 Exhibit 26, | ||
Att: 28 Exhibit 27, | ||
Att: 29 Exhibit 28, | ||
Att: 30 Exhibit 29, | ||
Att: 31 Exhibit 30, | ||
Att: 32 Exhibit 31, | ||
Att: 33 Exhibit 32, | ||
Att: 34 Exhibit 33, | ||
Att: 35 Exhibit 34, | ||
Att: 36 Exhibit 35, | ||
Att: 37 Exhibit 36, | ||
Att: 38 Exhibit 37 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 08/18 9:29 AM
PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by William Edward Williamson. (epri, ) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 08/10 11:33 AM
PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR RESPONSE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT17 filed by William Edward Williamson. (epri, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
motion
File Excess Pages
Thu 08/10 11:31 AM
MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT FOR RESPONSE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by William Edward Williamson. (epri, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
28
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 08/02 4:45 PM
Memorandum in Support re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Roseboro,. filed by Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker.(Harding, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Collins Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Smith Affidavit, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Austin Affidavit, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Bailey Affidavit, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit McDermott Affidavit, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit Edgar Affidavit, | ||
Att: 7 Affidavit Swygert Affidavit, | ||
Att: 8 Affidavit Mercer Affidavit, | ||
Att: 9 Affidavit Boone Affidavit, | ||
Att: 10 Affidavit Dean Affidavit, | ||
Att: 11 Affidavit Lamonea Affidavit, | ||
Att: 12 Affidavit McCormick Affidavit, | ||
Att: 13 Affidavit Pool Affidavit, | ||
Att: 14 Affidavit Scott Affidavit, | ||
Att: 15 Affidavit Walker Affidavit | ||
15 | 15
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 08/02 4:38 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Roseboro,. by Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker.(Harding, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Roseboro Notice | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/02 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Crawford Harding on behalf of Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker (Harding, Andrew) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
respoth
Objection
Tue 06/13 3:06 PM
Objection to this Court's Granting of the Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading re:11 Order filed by William Edward Williamson. (afar) |
|
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 06/13 10:17 AM
ORDER. Defendants'8 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendants are ORDERED to file their responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before August 3, 2023. Plaintiff's2 Motion for Pro Se E-Noticing is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to add Plaintiff's e-mail address to this case and to docket this Order in the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by District Judge Raymond A. Jackson on 6/12/23. (jhie, ) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 06/13 11:16 AM
Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by William Edward Williamson.(jhie, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Receipt | ||
Friday, June 09, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 06/09 3:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Brian T. Austin served on 5/26/2023; Michael Ross Bailey served on 5/25/2023; Samuel L. Boone, Jr served on 5/25/2023; Raymond Collins served on 5/26/2023; Amanda Grace Dean served on 5/25/2023; Laurie Edgar served on 5/31/2023; Michael K. Lamonea served on 5/25/2023; John M. McCormick served on 5/25/2023; Suzan L. McDermott served on 5/31/2023; Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr served on 5/25/2023; School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate) served on 5/25/2023; Angela B. Swygert served on 5/25/2023; Brittany Nicole Walker served on 5/25/2023; Norman Poole served on 5/26/2023; (epri, ) |
|
9 | 9
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Fri 06/09 9:35 AM
Memorandum in Support re8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, filed by Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker. (Lahren, Anne) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 06/09 9:34 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker. (Lahren, Anne) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/09 9:32 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Hoyt Matthews on behalf of Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker (Matthews, Richard) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/09 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Catherine Lahren on behalf of Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker (Lahren, Anne) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/07 3:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Norman Pool, served on 5/26/2023. (epri, ) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/07 3:42 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kimberly A. Scott, served on 5/26/2023. (epri, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/23 12:01 PM
Fifteen (15) Summonses Issued as to Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker. Clerk phoned pro se plaintiff to advise service packets are ready for pickup.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
2 | 2
motion
Pro Se E-Noticing
Tue 05/23 10:19 AM
MOTION for Pro Se E-Noticing by William Edward Williamson. (epri, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/23 10:19 AM
COMPLAINT against Brian T. Austin, Michael Ross Bailey, Samuel L. Boone, Jr, Raymond Collins, Amanda Grace Dean, Laurie Edgar, Michael K. Lamonea, John M. McCormick, Suzan L. McDermott, Thomas Lee Mercer, Sr, Norman Pool, School Board of the City of Chesapeake (Body Corporate), Kimberly A. Scott, Angela B. Swygert, Brittany Nicole Walker ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 200001462.), filed by William Edward Williamson.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt |