Monarch Networking Solutions LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | T S Ellis, III |
Referred: | Lindsey R Vaala |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00670 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 15:1126 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 03, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:30 AM EST |
Defendant
Juniper Networks, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Monarch Networking Solutions LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 05, 2023 | ||
72 | 72
utility
Report Regarding Patent & Trademark
Thu 10/05 10:11 AM
Final Report on the filing or determination of an action. (jlan) |
|
utility
Remark
Thu 10/05 10:08 AM
Case transferred from Virginia Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 4:23-cv-05076, filed 10/04/2023.(jlan) |
||
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
71 | 71
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion to Transfer Case
Tue 10/03 4:21 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Strike or, in the Alternative, to Conduct Venue Discovery62 is DENIED . It is further ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue35 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) is GRANTED . This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/3/2023. (tran) Modified to correct docket number on 10/3/2023 (Sbro) |
|
70 | 70
22
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Tue 10/03 4:13 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/3/2023. (tran) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Tue 10/03 4:26 PM
Case transferred to District of Northern District of California. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (tran) |