Jernigan v. Children's Medical Group, Inc.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jamar K Walker |
Referred: | Lawrence R Leonard |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00227 |
Nature of Suit | 445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 19, 2023 5:30 AM EST |
Defendant
Children's Medical Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anna M Jernigan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/28 8:43 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Anna M Jernigan. (Gaynor, Todd) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 09/22 10:14 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant's responsive pleading shall be filed on or before October 9, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard on 9/22/23. (jhie, ) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 09/21 11:48 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Children's Medical Group, Inc..(Kushner, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Extension of Time | ||
utility
Motions Referred
Thu 09/21 3:08 PM
MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard.5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (jhie, ) |
||
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Brief - Respondent
Tue 09/12 4:57 PM
Respondent's BRIEF by Anna M Jernigan . (Gaynor, Todd) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Fri 09/08 5:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anna M Jernigan. Children's Medical Group, Inc. waiver sent on 7/26/2023, answer due 9/25/2023. (Gaynor, Todd) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 08/24 11:52 AM
ORDER. As of the date of this Order, the plaintiff has not filed notice that Defendant Children's Medical Group, Inc. has been served. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days, the plaintiff must show cause, if any, why this action should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 8/24/23. (jhie, ) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/23 2:18 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8948643.), filed by Anna M Jernigan.(Gaynor, Todd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Tue 05/23 2:31 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Jamar K. Walker and Magistrate Judge Lawrence R. Leonard. (epri, ) |