Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Lopez
Case #: 4:23-bk-90584
Case Filed:May 24, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
QualTek Services Inc.
475 Sentry Parkway E Suite 200
Blue Bell, PA 19422
Represented By
Emily Meraia
Jackson Walker
contact info
Matthew D Cavenaugh
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Genevieve Marie Graham
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Ha Minh Nguyen
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
163 163 misc Certificate Wed 05/31 6:29 PM
Certificate of Service by Sharna Wilson (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ) Related [+] (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] 47 Generic Order,90 Order on Emergency Motion,94 Order on Emergency Motion
162 162 misc AO435 Transcript Request Wed 05/31 2:05 PM
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (Daily (24 hours)) by William A. (Trey) Wood III. This is to order a transcript of First Day Hearing on May 24, 2023 before Judge Christopher Lopez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas (Filed By PNC Bank, N.A. ). (Wood, William)
Related: [-]
161 161 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/31 1:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Donald L Turbyfill Filed by on behalf of Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Turbyfill, Donald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
160 160 misc Certificate Tue 05/30 3:55 PM
Certificate of Service by Cassandra Murray Related [+] (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ) (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-] : 2, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, 11, 12, 14, 1610 Emergency Motion (with hearing date),13 Declaration,15 Declaration,42 Order for Joint Administration,48 Order on Emergency Motion,90 Order on Emergency Motion,91 Generic Order,92 Order on Emergency Motion,93 Order on Emergency Motion,94 Order on Emergency Motion,95 Order on Emergency Motion,96 Order on Emergency Motion,97 Order on Emergency Motion,98 Order on Emergency Motion,103 Order on Emergency Motion
159 159 misc Debtors Master Service List Tue 05/30 1:19 PM
Debtors Master Service List (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ). (Garabato, Sid)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 28, 2023
158 158 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/28 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 23. Notice Date 05/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 115 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
157 157 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/28 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 23. Notice Date 05/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 114 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
156 156 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/28 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 23. Notice Date 05/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 113 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
155 155 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/28 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 23. Notice Date 05/28/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 112 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
Saturday, May 27, 2023
154 154 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 103 Order on Emergency Motion
153 153 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 98 Order on Emergency Motion
152 152 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 97 Order on Emergency Motion
151 151 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 96 Order on Emergency Motion
150 150 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 95 Order on Emergency Motion
149 149 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 94 Order on Emergency Motion
148 148 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 93 Order on Emergency Motion
147 147 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 92 Order on Emergency Motion
146 146 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 91 Generic Order
145 145 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 05/27 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 20. Notice Date 05/27/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 90 Order on Emergency Motion
Friday, May 26, 2023
144 144 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 87 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
143 143 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 86 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
142 142 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 81 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
141 141 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 79 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
140 140 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 78 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
139 139 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 18. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 77 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
138 138 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 74 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
137 137 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 72 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
136 136 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 17. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 71 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
135 135 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 16. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 65 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
134 134 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 64 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
133 133 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 63 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
132 132 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 14. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 62 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
131 131 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 55 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
130 130 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 54 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
129 129 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 53 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
128 128 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 52 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
127 127 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 51 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
126 126 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 50 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
125 125 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 49 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
124 124 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 48 Order on Emergency Motion
123 123 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 47 Generic Order
122 122 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 41 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
121 121 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 40 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
120 120 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
119 119 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
118 118 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
117 117 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
116 116 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/26 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 05/26/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 42 Order for Joint Administration
115 115 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Fri 05/26 1:55 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Andy C. Warshaw Related [+]. Signed on 5/26/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 111
114 114 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Fri 05/26 1:55 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Mark J. Chaney Related [+]. Signed on 5/26/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 108
113 113 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Fri 05/26 1:54 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Richard A. Aguilar Related [+]. Signed on 5/26/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 106
112 112 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Fri 05/26 1:53 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Laura E. Appleby Related [+]. Signed on 5/26/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 105
111 111 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 05/26 11:27 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice . Filed by Creditor G&A Innovation Construction (Warshaw, Andy)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 05/26 8:19 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Garza, Vianey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
110 110 court No Creditor Mailing List Thu 05/25 4:50 PM
No Creditor Mailing List (MayraMarquez)
Related: [-]
109 109 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/25 3:47 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Mark J. Chaney III Filed by on behalf of ARI Fleet LT, Automotive Rentals, Inc. (Chaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
108 108 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 05/25 3:46 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Mark J. Chaney . Filed by Creditors ARI Fleet LT, Automotive Rentals, Inc. (Chaney, Mark)
Related: [-]
107 107 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/25 3:44 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard A Aguilar Filed by on behalf of ARI Fleet LT, Automotive Rentals, Inc. (Aguilar, Richard)
Related: [-]
106 106 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 05/25 3:43 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Richard A. Aguilar . Filed by Creditors ARI Fleet LT, Automotive Rentals, Inc. (Aguilar, Richard)
Related: [-]
105 105 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 05/25 11:53 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Laura E. Appleby . Filed by Creditor UMB Bank, N.A. (Perry, Kristen)
Related: [-]
104 104 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/25 11:51 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kristen L Perry Filed by on behalf of UMB Bank, N.A. (Perry, Kristen)
Related: [-]
103 103 469 pgs order Emergency (Hearing) Thu 05/25 8:13 AM
Order Granting Emergency DIP Financing Motion Related [+] Signed on 5/25/2023. (clopez)
Related: [-] 14
102 102 misc Proposed Order Submission After Hearing (Greensheet) Thu 05/25 7:48 AM
Proposed Order Submission After Hearing (Filed By QualTek Services Inc. ) Related [+] (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-] 14 Emergency Motion (with hearing date)
Att: 1 Redline
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
101 101 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/24 7:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Matthew Scott Parmet Filed by on behalf of Quinten Jones (Parmet, Matthew)
Related: [-]
100 100 1 pgs audio MP3 Wed 05/24 7:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/24/2023 5:00:10 PM ]. File Size [ 44602 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:32:55 ]. (Hearing on First Day Motions.). (admin)
Related: [-]
99 99 2 pgs court Courtroom Minutes Wed 05/24 6:51 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 5:00 PM. Appearances: PLEASE SEE ATTACHED. Related [+]. Hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Motions Granted. Orders Signed. The Disclosure Statement is Conditionally Approved. Order Signed. Parties are to notify the Court's Case Manager once a revised Proposed Order on is filed. Hearing on scheduled for 6/13/2023 at 02:00 PM. Final Approval of the Disclosure Statement and Plan Confirmation is scheduled for 6/30/2023 at 01:00 PM. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] :5 ,6 ,7 ,8 ,9 ,10 ,11 ,12 ,14 ,16 Emergency Motions.14 s. 10 and 14
98 98 order Emergency (Hearing) Wed 05/24 6:32 PM
Order (I) Waiving the Requirement to File a List of Equity Security Holders, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Redact Certain Personally Identifiable Information, (III) Approving the Form and Manner of the Notice of Commencement, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 7
97 97 order Emergency (Hearing) Wed 05/24 6:29 PM
Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue Insurance Coverage Entered Into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto, (B) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies, (C) Continue to Pay Brokerage Fees, (D) Maintain and Enter Into New Premium Financing Agreements, and (E) Maintain the Surety Bond Program, and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 12
96 96 order Emergency (Hearing) Wed 05/24 6:27 PM
Order (I) Authorizing the Payment of Certain Taxes and Fees, and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 8
95 95 order Emergency (Hearing) Wed 05/24 6:25 PM
Order (I) Approving the Debtors Proposed Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services, (II) Prohibiting Utility Providers From Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services, (III) Approving the Debtors Proposed Procedures for Resolving Adequate Assurance Requests, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 5
94 94 order Emergency (Hearing) Wed 05/24 6:23 PM
Order (I) Approving Notification and Hearing Procedures for Certain Transfers and Declarations of Worthlessness with Respect to Common Stock, and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 6
93 93 order Emergency (Hearing) Wed 05/24 6:22 PM
Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue Their Prepetition Business Operations, Policies, and Practices and Pay Related Claims in the Ordinary Course of Business on a Postpetition Basis, (II) Granting Administrative Expense Priority to All Outstanding Orders and Authorizing the Debtors to Satisfy Such Obligations in the Ordinary Course, and (III) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 11
92 92 order Emergency (Hearing) Wed 05/24 6:20 PM
Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Other Compensation, and Other Reimbursable Expenses, and (B) Continue Employee Benefits Programs and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 9
91 91 order Generic Order Wed 05/24 6:18 PM
Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue to Operate Their Cash Managment System, (B) Maintain Existing Bank Accounts, Business Forms, and Books and Records, (II) Authorizing Continued Intercompany Transactions, (III) Granting Administrative Expense Status to Postpetition Intercompany Transactions, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 10 Emergency Motion (with hearing date)
90 90 111 pgs order Emergency (Hearing) Wed 05/24 6:08 PM
Order (I) Scheduling a Combined Disclosure Statement Approval and Plan Confirmation Hearing, (II) Conditionally Approving the Disclosure Statement, (III) Approving the Solicitation Procedures, (IV) Approving the Disclosure Statement at the Combined Hearing, (V) Waiving Certain Mailing of the Solicitation Package, (VI) Approving the Form and Manner of the Notices, (VII) Approving the Form and Manner of the Notices, (VIII) Extending the Time by Which (A) the U.S. Trustee Convenes a Meeting of Creditors and (B) the Debtors File Schedules and SOFAs, and (IX) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 16
89 89 notice Notice Wed 05/24 5:44 PM
Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers . Related [+] Filed by PNC Bank, N.A. (Wood, William)
Related: [-] 44 Notice of Appearance
88 88 misc AO435 Transcript Request Wed 05/24 5:24 PM
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (Daily (24 hours)) by Genevieve M. Graham. This is to order a transcript of 5/24/2023 before Judge Christopher Lopez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas (Filed By QualTek Services Inc. ). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
87 87 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 5:10 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Alexander Hevia Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 82
86 86 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 5:09 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Brian J. Lohan Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 80
85 85 274 pgs plan Disclosure Statement Wed 05/24 5:04 PM
Disclosure Statement Filed by QualTek Services Inc..(Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Redline
84 84 misc Proposed Order Wed 05/24 4:47 PM
Proposed Order RE: Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors, for the Interim Period, to (A) Obtain Postpetition Financing and (B) Use Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Liens and Providing Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Granting Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (V) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (VI) Granting Related Relief (Filed By QualTek Services Inc. ) Related [+] (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-] 14 Emergency Motion (with hearing date)
Att: 1 Redline
83 83 6 pgs misc Statement Wed 05/24 4:42 PM
Statement - Verified Statement Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2019 of Ad Hoc Group of Term Loan Lenders (Filed By Ad Hoc Group of Term Loan Lenders ). (Higgins, John)
Related: [-]
82 82 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:31 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Alexander Hevia . Filed by Creditors AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Kruse, Charles)
Related: [-]
81 81 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:30 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Julia B. Mosse, Esq. Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 73
80 80 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:30 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Brian J. Lohan . Filed by Creditors AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T Services Inc. (Kruse, Charles)
Related: [-]
79 79 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:30 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Michael E. Comerford, Esq. Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 70
78 78 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:29 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Cindi M. Giglio, Esq. Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 69
77 77 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:28 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Steven J. Reisman, Esq. Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 68
76 76 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/24 4:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Charles Thomas Kruse Filed by on behalf of AT&T Services Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC (Kruse, Charles)
Related: [-]
75 75 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/24 4:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Keith Langley Filed by on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Langley, Keith)
Related: [-]
74 74 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:11 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Tyler Zelinger Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 61
73 73 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:09 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Julia B. Mosse, Esq. . Filed by Interested Party Brightstar Capital Partners, LP and its affiliates Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
72 72 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:09 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Michael J. Colarossi Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 60
71 71 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:08 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Elizabeth R. McColm Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 59
70 70 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:07 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael E. Comerford, Esq. . Filed by Interested Party Brightstar Capital Partners, LP and its affiliates Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
69 69 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:04 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Cindi M. Giglio, Esq. . Filed by Interested Party Brightstar Capital Partners, LP and its affiliates Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
68 68 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 4:02 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Steven J. Reisman, Esq. . Filed by Interested Party Brightstar Capital Partners, LP and its affiliates Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
67 67 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/24 3:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Steven J. Reisman Filed by on behalf of Brightstar Capital Partners, LP and its affiliates Related [+]
Related: [-] isman, Steven
66 66 misc Certificate Wed 05/24 3:53 PM
Certificate of Diane Streany of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] [2, 4] (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ).(Related document(s):3 Designation of Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case,5 Emergency Motion (with hearing date),6 Emergency Motion (with hearing date),7 Emergency Motion (with hearing date),8 Emergency Motion (with hearing date),9 Emergency Motion (with hearing date),10 Emergency Motion (with hearing date),11 Emergency Motion (with hearing date),12 Emergency Motion (with hearing date),13 Declaration,14 Emergency Motion (with hearing date),16 Emergency Motion (with hearing date),28 Exhibit List, Witness List,29 Notice,35 Agenda) (Garabato, Sid
65 65 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 3:34 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Andrew N. Rosenberg Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 58
64 64 2 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:43 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to John E. Lucian Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 46
63 63 2 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:43 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Regina Stango Kelbo Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 45
62 62 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:42 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Lindsey Blum Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 43
61 61 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:41 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Tyler Zelinger . Filed by Interested Party Ad Hoc Group of Term Loan Lenders (Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-]
60 60 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:40 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Michael J. Colarossi . Filed by Interested Party Ad Hoc Group of Term Loan Lenders (Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-]
59 59 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:39 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Elizabeth R. McColm . Filed by Interested Party Ad Hoc Group of Term Loan Lenders (Higgins, John)
Related: [-]
58 58 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:38 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Andrew N. Rosenberg . Filed by Interested Party Ad Hoc Group of Term Loan Lenders (Higgins, John)
Related: [-]
57 57 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/24 2:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by John F Higgins IV Filed by on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Term Loan Lenders (Higgins, John)
Related: [-]
56 56 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/24 2:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Julie Anne Parsons Filed by on behalf of The County of Comal, Texas (Parsons, Julie)
Related: [-]
55 55 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:21 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Damian S. Schaible Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 31
54 54 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:21 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to David Moskowitz Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 32
53 53 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:20 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Dacvid Schiff Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 33
52 52 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:19 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Christopher Pavlovich Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 27
51 51 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:17 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Richard J. Steinberg Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 34
50 50 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:17 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Oliver Pare Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 26
49 49 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:14 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Erica D. Clark Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 25
48 48 order Emergency (Hearing) Wed 05/24 2:12 PM
Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims, Noticing, and Solicitation Agent Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 4
47 47 order Generic Order Wed 05/24 2:10 PM
Order Granting Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Treatment. Signed on 5/24/2023. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-]
46 46 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:10 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice John E. Lucian . Filed by Creditor PNC Bank, N.A. (Wood, William)
Related: [-]
45 45 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 2:08 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Regina Stango Kelbon . Filed by Creditor PNC Bank, N.A. (Wood, William)
Related: [-]
44 44 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/24 2:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by William Alfred Wood III Filed by on behalf of PNC Bank, N.A. (Wood, William)
Related: [-]
43 43 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 1:30 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Lindsey Blum . Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
42 42 order Joint Administration Wed 05/24 1:20 PM
Order for Joint Administration Signed on 5/24/2023 Related [+]. (RosarioSaldana)
Related: [-] 2
41 41 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 1:19 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Alison Wirtz Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 24
40 40 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 1:16 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Casey McGushin Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 23
39 39 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 1:13 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Joshua Greenblatt, P.C. Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 22
38 38 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 1:11 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Jaimie Fedell Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 21
37 37 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 1:03 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Christopher T. Greco Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 20
36 36 1 pgs order Order to Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 1:00 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice as to Joshua A. Sussberg Related [+]. Signed on 5/24/2023. (ZildeCompean)
Related: [-] 19
35 35 misc Agenda Wed 05/24 10:43 AM
Agenda for Hearing on 5/24/2023 (Filed By QualTek Services Inc. ). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
34 34 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 10:22 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Richard J. Steinberg . Filed by Creditor Fortress Credit Advisors LLC or affiliate managed funds (Beckham, Charles)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 10:19 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of David Schiff . Filed by Creditor Fortress Credit Advisors LLC or affiliate managed funds (Beckham, Charles)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 10:16 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Elliot Moskowitz . Filed by Creditor Fortress Credit Advisors LLC or affiliate managed funds (Beckham, Charles)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 10:15 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Damian S. Schaible . Filed by Creditor Fortress Credit Advisors LLC or affiliate managed funds (Beckham, Charles)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/24 10:09 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Charles A Beckham Jr Filed by on behalf of Fortress Credit Advisors LLC or affiliate managed funds (Beckham, Charles)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice Wed 05/24 9:41 AM
Notice of Electronic First Day Hearing . Filed by QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Exhibit List Wed 05/24 9:17 AM
Exhibit List, Witness List (Filed By QualTek Services Inc. ). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
27 27 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 9:04 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Christopher Pavlovich . Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 9:03 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Oliver Pare . Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
25 25 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 9:01 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Erica D. Clark . Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 9:00 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Alison Wirtz . Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 8:59 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Casey McGushin . Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 8:58 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Joshua Greenblatt . Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 8:57 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Jaimie Fedell . Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 8:56 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Christopher T. Greco . Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 05/24 8:55 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Joshua A. Sussberg . Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
18 18 plan Disclosure Statement Wed 05/24 8:51 AM
Disclosure Statement Filed by QualTek Services Inc.. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
17 17 plan Chapter 11 Plan Wed 05/24 8:43 AM
Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by QualTek Services Inc.. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Emergency Motion (Hearing Date Obtained Prior to Filing) Wed 05/24 8:37 AM
Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Scheduling a Combined Disclosure Statement Approval and Plan Confirmation Hearing, (II) Conditionally Approving the Disclosure Statement, (III) Approving the Solicitation Procedures, (IV) Approving the Disclosure Statement at the Combined Hearing, (V) Waiving Certain Mailing of the Solicitation Package, (VI) Approving the Form and Manner of the Notices, (VII) Approving the Form and Manner of the Notices, (VIII) Extending the Time by Which (A) the U.S. Trustee Convenes a Meeting of Creditors and (B) the Debtors File Schedules and SOFAs, and (IX) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2023 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 misc Declaration Wed 05/24 8:26 AM
Declaration re: Declaration of Jeffrey Finger in Support of Debtors' Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Postpetition Financing and (B) Use Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Liens and Providing Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Granting Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (V) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (IV) Granting Related Relief (Filed By QualTek Services Inc. ) Related [+] (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-] 14 Emergency Motion (with hearing date)
14 14 49 pgs motion Emergency Motion (Hearing Date Obtained Prior to Filing) Wed 05/24 8:18 AM
Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Postpetition Financing and (B) Use Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Liens and Providing Superpriority Administrative Expense Claims, (III) Granting Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, (IV) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (V) Scheduling a Final Hearing, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2023 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 misc Declaration Wed 05/24 8:12 AM
Declaration re: Declaration of Cari Turner, Chief Restructuring Officer of QualTek Services Inc. and Certain of its Affiliates and Subsidiaries, in Support of the Debtors Chapter 11 Petitions and First Day Motions (Filed By QualTek Services Inc. ). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Emergency Motion (Hearing Date Obtained Prior to Filing) Wed 05/24 7:11 AM
Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue Insurance Coverage Entered Into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto, (B) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies, (C) Continue to Pay Brokerage Fees, (D) Maintain and Enter Into New Premium Financing Agreements, and (E) Maintain the Surety Bond Program, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2023 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
11 11 motion Emergency Motion (Hearing Date Obtained Prior to Filing) Wed 05/24 6:49 AM
Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Continue Their Prepetition Business Operations, Policies, and Practices and Pay Related Claims in the Ordinary Course of Business on a Postpetition Basis, (II) Granting Administrative Expense Priority to All Outstanding Orders and Authorizing the Debtors to Satisfy Such Obligations in the Ordinary Course, and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2023 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Emergency Motion (Hearing Date Obtained Prior to Filing) Wed 05/24 6:42 AM
Emergency Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Continue to Operate Their Cash Managment System, (B) Maintain Existing Bank Accounts, Business Forms, and Books and Records, (II) Authorizing Continued Intercompany Transactions, (III) Granting Administrative Expense Status to Postpetition Intercompany Transactions, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2023 at 03:00 PM at telephone and video conference. (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Interim Proposed Order
Att: 2 Final Proposed Order
9 9 motion Emergency Motion (Hearing Date Obtained Prior to Filing) Wed 05/24 6:40 AM
Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Other Compensation, and Other Reimbursable Expenses, and (B) Continue Employee Benefits Programs and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2023 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 motion Emergency Motion (Hearing Date Obtained Prior to Filing) Wed 05/24 6:36 AM
Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Payment of Certain Taxes and Fees, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2023 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Emergency Motion (Hearing Date Obtained Prior to Filing) Wed 05/24 6:33 AM
Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Waiving the Requirement to File a List of Equity Security Holders, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to Redact Certain Personally Identifiable Information, (III) Approving the Form and Manner of the Notice of Commencement, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2023 at 03:00 PM at telephone and video conference. (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Emergency Motion (Hearing Date Obtained Prior to Filing) Wed 05/24 6:31 AM
Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Notification and Hearing Procedures for Certain Transfers and Declarations of Worthlessness with Respect to Common Stock, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2023 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
5 5 motion Emergency Motion (Hearing Date Obtained Prior to Filing) Wed 05/24 6:14 AM
Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Debtors Proposed Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services, (II) Prohibiting Utility Providers From Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Services, (III) Approving the Debtors Proposed Procedures for Resolving Adequate Assurance Requests, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2023 at 03:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 401 (CML). (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 motion Emergency Motion (Hearing Date Obtained Prior to Filing) Wed 05/24 6:13 AM
Emergency Motion Debtors' Emergency Ex Parte Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims, Noticing, and Solicitation Agent Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2023 at 03:00 PM at telephone and video conference. (Cavenaugh, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 misc Designation of Complex Case Wed 05/24 5:54 AM
Designation of Complex Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Filed By QualTek Services Inc. ). (Meraia, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
2 2 motion Emergency Motion Wed 05/24 5:52 AM
Emergency Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Debtor QualTek Services Inc. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
1 1 35 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Wed 05/24 5:08 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by QualTek Services Inc.. (Graham, Genevieve)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/24 8:45 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ha Minh Nguyen (Nguyen, Ha)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 05/24 12:14 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-90584 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A24445828. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]