Dahoud v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonie M Brinkema |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00679 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2024 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:55 AM EST |
Defendant
Director Jedidah Hussey
Arlington, VA 22209
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
Camp Springs, MD 20588
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
5900 Capital Gateway Drive
Camp Springs, MD 20588 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zeinebou Dahoud
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, February 26, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
So Ordered
Mon 02/26 3:37 PM
So Ordered in re14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/26/2024. (Dest) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 02/26 10:41 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Zeinebou Dahoud (Vasseghi, Roya) |
|
Saturday, July 29, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 07/31 7:28 AM
ORDERED that the parties' motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the instant action is STAYED until further order of this Court; and it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file status reports with this Court every sixty (60) days after Plaintiff's asylum interview in re12 Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/29/2023. (swil) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Stay
Fri 07/28 4:30 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by Jedidah Hussey, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services.(Spavins, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/28 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Spavins on behalf of Jedidah Hussey, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (Spavins, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 06/26 11:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zeinebou Dahoud. All Defendants.(Vasseghi, Roya) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt | ||
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro hac vice
Tue 05/30 7:57 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Pro hac vice Appointed James Oliver Hacking, III for Zeinebou Dahoud. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 5/26/2023. (swil) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Fri 05/26 3:06 PM
Summons Issued as to Jedidah Hussey, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(swil) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Notice | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 05/26 3:07 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (swil) |
||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/24 12:34 PM
Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James O. Hacking III and Certification of Local Counsel Roya Vasseghi Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-8950618. by Zeinebou Dahoud. (Vasseghi, Roya) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 05/24 12:33 PM
Proposed Summons by Zeinebou Dahoud. (Vasseghi, Roya) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 05/24 12:32 PM
Proposed Summons by Zeinebou Dahoud. (Vasseghi, Roya) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 05/24 12:31 PM
Proposed Summons by Zeinebou Dahoud. (Vasseghi, Roya) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 05/24 12:31 PM
Proposed Summons by Zeinebou Dahoud. (Vasseghi, Roya) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Wed 05/24 12:30 PM
Proposed Summons by Zeinebou Dahoud. (Vasseghi, Roya) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/24 12:12 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8950553.), filed by Zeinebou Dahoud.(Vasseghi, Roya) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |