Ettienne v. Corney Transportation, Inc. et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael S Nachmanoff |
Referred: | Ivan D Davis |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00681 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury/ Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jul 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:55 AM EST |
Defendant
Corney Transportation, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wayne Walat
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Ettienne
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Mon 07/10 4:17 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Dkt. No. 5) is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED to the Circuit Court for the County of Stafford, Virginia. Signed by District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff on 7/10/2023. (show) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (other)
Thu 07/06 2:45 PM
NOTICE by Andre Ettienne re6 Memorandum in Support (Rastegar, Jouya) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
16
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Wed 07/05 6:20 PM
Memorandum in Support re5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Andre Ettienne. (Rastegar, Jouya) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Remand to State Court
Wed 07/05 6:19 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Andre Ettienne. (Rastegar, Jouya) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Wed 06/07 4:24 PM
Letter from the Court to Attorney Scott D. Carlton regarding Notice of Removal from Stafford County Circuit Court. (show) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/24 2:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Corney Transportation, Inc.. (Michelle, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 05/24 1:54 PM
Civil Cover Sheet re1 Notice of Removal, by Corney Transportation, Inc., Wayne Wallat. (Michelle, Paul) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Wed 05/24 1:51 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8950749.), filed by Wayne Wallat, Corney Transportation, Inc..(Michelle, Paul) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 05/26 2:00 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Michael S Nachmanoff and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (show) |