Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Patricia Tolliver Giles |
Referred: | Lindsey R Vaala |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00687 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:56 AM EST |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 05, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
utility
Report Regarding Copyright
Tue 09/05 9:08 PM
Final Report on the filing or determination of an action. (Dest) |
|
12 | 12
order
So Ordered
Tue 09/05 8:47 PM
So Ordered in re11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 9/5/2023. (Dest) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 09/01 5:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Wed 08/23 3:54 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion8 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART . Plaintiff shall have until September 18, 2023 to effectuate service of a summons and Complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 8/23/2023. (tran) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Waiver of
Wed 08/23 6:24 AM
Waiver of re8 MOTION for Extension To Effectuate Service Oral Argument by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of
Wed 08/23 6:22 AM
MOTION for Extension To Effectuate Service by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order | ||
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Mon 06/26 10:20 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala on 06/26/2023. (dvanm) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Waiver of
Thu 06/22 11:56 AM
Waiver of Oral Argument by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
5 | 5
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 06/22 11:55 AM
Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Williamson Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Paige Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Stalzer Declaration | ||
4 | 4
motion
Discovery
Thu 06/22 11:54 AM
MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 05/24 10:20 PM
NOTICE by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC AO 121 Report on Filing Copyright(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/24 10:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/24 10:18 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8951781.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 05/25 8:24 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles and Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (dvanm) |