Strike 3 v. Doe
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | John F Anderson |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00689 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 24, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 20, 2023 3:56 AM EST |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Plaintiff
Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 09, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
utility
Report Regarding Copyright
Wed 08/09 7:15 PM
Final Report on the filing or determination of an action AO 121 . (Dest) |
|
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/09 7:09 PM
ORDER in re8 NOTICE of Settlement and Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice . All claims against Defendant are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 8/9/2023. (Dest) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/01 9:54 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Thu 06/22 1:37 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party (see Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/22/2023. (swil) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Waiver of
Thu 06/22 12:02 PM
Waiver of Oral Argument by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
5 | 5
15
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 06/22 12:01 PM
Memorandum in Support re4 MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Williamson Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Paige Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C- Stalzer Declaration | ||
4 | 4
motion
Discovery
Thu 06/22 12:00 PM
MOTION for Discovery Leave to Serve Third-Party by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (other)
Wed 05/24 10:31 PM
NOTICE by Strike 3 AO 121 Report on Filing Copyright(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/24 10:29 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3. (Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/24 10:28 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8951789.), filed by Strike 3.(Sciarrino, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - single transaction of each work infringed, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 05/25 10:11 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (swil) |