Dejene v. Jaddou et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rossie D Alston, Jr |
Referred: | William E Fitzpatrick |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00698 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:0706 Judicial Review of Agency Action |
Case Filed: | May 25, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 21, 2023 4:02 AM EST |
Defendant
Antonio Donis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Betelhem Dejene
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 08/23 2:15 PM
ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with Prejudice in re9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 8/23/2023. (Dest) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/22 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Betelhem Dejene (Goodman, John) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/04 8:50 AM
STATUS REPORT by Antonio Donis, Ur Mendoza Jaddou. (O'Connor, Kirstin) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Wed 07/05 3:09 PM
ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED this matter is STAYED; FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report every thirty (30) days during the pendency of the stay. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 07/05/2023. (tran) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Stay
Wed 06/28 4:58 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by Antonio Donis, Ur Mendoza Jaddou.(O'Connor, Kirstin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/28 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kirstin O'Connor on behalf of Antonio Donis, Ur Mendoza Jaddou (O'Connor, Kirstin) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/21 3:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John William Goodman on behalf of Betelhem Dejene (Goodman, John) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Thu 05/25 5:16 PM
Summons Issued as to Antonio Donis, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Summons Returned Unexecuted as to USA.(Sbro) |
|
Att: 1 Notice to Attorney | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 05/25 4:18 PM
Proposed Summons by Betelhem Dejene. (Taylor, Alaina) (Main Document 1 replaced to correct PDF fillable form on 5/25/2023) (Sbro) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/25 4:12 PM
Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8953731.), filed by Betelhem Dejene.(Taylor, Alaina) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Notice of Correction
Thu 05/25 4:45 PM
Notice of Correction re2 Proposed Summons. Summons was filed as a fillable form which we have replaced. For future reference the filing must be in PDF form. (Sbro) |
||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Thu 05/25 5:08 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (Sbro) |