MPAS Moving Springfield, LLC v. Home Furnishings Resource Group, Inc.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | T S Ellis, III |
Referred: | Lindsey R Vaala |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00700 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1346 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 12, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 7:32 AM EST |
Defendant
Home Furnishings Resource Group Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MPAS Moving Springfield, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
So Ordered
Thu 10/12 3:39 PM
So Ordered re10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice filed by MPAS Moving Springfield, LLC. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/12/2023. (tran) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 10/12 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MPAS Moving Springfield, LLC (Burns, Eric) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2023 | ||
utility
Remark
Tue 10/03 12:23 PM
The parties have advised the Court that they have reached a settlement in this matter. Accordingly, the settlement conference scheduled for October 4, 2023 is cancelled. The parties are directed to file by October 17, 2023 a notice of dismissal, or, alternatively, a status report informing the Court why more time is needed to dismiss the matter and when the dismissal will be filed. (wgar, ) |
||
utility
Terminate Deadlines
Tue 10/03 12:24 PM
***Deadlines terminated - Settlement Conference set for 10/4/2023 - TERMINATED. (wgar, ) |
||
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 09/01 8:56 AM
Set Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/4/2023 at 12:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. (nneb) |
||
Tuesday, August 29, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Settlement
Tue 08/29 1:35 PM
ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for Settlement Conference8 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART . It is further ORDERED that the parties are DIRECTED to contact the chambers of U.S. Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala to schedule a prompt settlement conference. It is further ORDERED that the Scheduling Order3 shall REMAIN IN FULL FORCE AND EFFECT unless and until a motion for a modification is filed. Any motion for modification of the scheduling order must provide good cause therefor, pursuant to Rule 16(b)(4), Fed. R. Civ. P. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 8/29/2023. (tran) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 08/29 1:09 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lindsey R. Vaala. Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (jlan) |
||
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Settlement
Mon 08/21 1:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference by MPAS Moving Springfield, LLC.(Burns, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/11 2:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Supernor on behalf of MPAS Moving Springfield, LLC(Supernor, Hannah) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
6
pgs
order
Order Rule 16b Scheduling Order
Tue 06/27 9:08 AM
Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Because the parties Joint Rule 26(f) Report [Dkt. No. 5] adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for June 28, 2023, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Courts June 5, 2023, Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Joint Rule 26(f) Report, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 06/26/2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, ) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report of Rule 26 f Planning Meeting
Fri 06/16 12:57 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Home Furnishings Resource Group Inc.. (Starks, Ryan) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/06 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan John Starks on behalf of Home Furnishings Resource Group Inc. (Starks, Ryan) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/06 12:23 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 6/28/2023 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 10/27/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2023 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (If the parties do not file dispositive motions). Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2024 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (If the parties do file dispositive motions). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 6/5/2023.(dzir) |
|
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent, | ||
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice | ||
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/02 1:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Defendant's Answer by Home Furnishings Resource Group Inc..(Holt, Kevin) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Fri 05/26 11:07 AM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8954779.), filed by Home Furnishings Resource Group, Inc. d/b/a Function First Furniture.(Holt, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Circuit Court Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Other Pleadings, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Notice to Clerk of Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit Financial Interest Disclosure Statement | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 05/26 3:17 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (swil) |