Omega Protein, Inc. v. Selective Insurance Co. of the Southeast et al
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry E Hudson |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00347 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 29, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 7:32 AM EST |
Defendant
Tjorvi Jonasson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Selective Insurance Co. of the Southeast
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Omega Protein, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 02/29 10:17 AM
FINAL ORDER that THIS MATTER is before the Court on a Stipulation of Dismissal13 filed by the parties on February 28, 2024, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The parties represent that all claims have been fully resolved and compromised. Therefore, it is HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. This case is CLOSED. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 2/29/2024. (jenjones, ) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 02/28 3:57 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Omega Protein, Inc.. (Henderson, Marissa) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Settlement (by Attorney)
Wed 02/21 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Omega Protein, Inc. (Henderson, Marissa) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 09/07 10:33 AM
ORDER This matter is before the Court on Defendant's Motion to Stay9 . The motion is GRANTED. The proceeding is hereby STAYED until the resolution of 3:23-cv-219. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 9/7/2023. (Kat) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support
Thu 08/03 1:37 PM
Memorandum in Support re9 MOTION to Stay filed by Tjorvi Jonasson. (Yakubisin, Christopher) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Stay
Thu 08/03 1:36 PM
MOTION to Stay by Tjorvi Jonasson. (Yakubisin, Christopher) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Citizenship Disclosure Form
Thu 08/03 1:35 PM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Tjorvi Jonasson. (Yakubisin, Christopher) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/03 1:32 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Tjorvi Jonasson.(Yakubisin, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 06/27 10:41 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Selective Insurance Co. of the Southeast. (Johnson, Harold) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/26 11:47 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Selective Insurance Co. of the Southeast.(Johnson, Harold) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/26 12:43 PM
Summons Issued as to Tjorvi Jonasson and Selective Insurance Co. of the Southeast. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted. (jsmi, ) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 05/26 10:39 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,,, to Tjorvi Jonasson by Omega Protein, Inc.. (Henderson, Marissa) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Fri 05/26 10:38 AM
Proposed Summons re1 Complaint,,, to Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast by Omega Protein, Inc.. (Henderson, Marissa) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 05/26 10:36 AM
Complaint For Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8954668.), filed by Omega Protein, Inc..(Henderson, Marissa) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/26/2023) (jsmi, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Selective Policy, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B- Jonasson Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C- OP's Answer to Jonasson Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D- OP's Third Party Complaint against Martin Control, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E- Master Services Contract, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F- Certificate of Insurance, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G- Letter of Representation, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit H- Notice of Claim to Martin Control, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit I- Notice of Claim to Selective, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit J- Selective's Initial Tender Response, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit K- Update Emails, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit L- Renewal of Tender to Munley, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit M- March-April 2023 Emails, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit N- Selective Denial of Tender | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 05/26 12:40 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (jsmi, ) |