Jordan v. Freeman, et al.
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Gibney, Jr |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00351 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 26, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2023 7:33 AM EST |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Deputy Samuel Freeman
|
|
Defendant
Deputy Dwayne Gaines
|
|
Defendant
Deputy Randy Holmes
|
|
Defendant
Deputy Shawnta Pender
|
|
Plaintiff
Ralph Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
4
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 04/09 1:49 PM
ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - The Court has scheduled this case for a settlement conference on September 17, 2024, at 9:30 A.M. At that time, the parties shall report to the chambers of Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Summer L. Speight on 4/9/2024. (smej, ) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 04/08 10:48 AM
Reset Hearing: Jury Trial rescheduled for 11/5/2024 at 09:00 AM in Richmond Courtroom 6000 before District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. (wtuc) |
||
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
55 | 55
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 04/04 2:51 PM
ORDER that the Court CONTINUES the trial to November 5-7, 2024. Trial will begin each day at 9:00 a.m. All other deadlines in the initial pretrial order remain in effect. (See ECF No.54 .) It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr. on 4/4/2024. (jenjones, ) |