Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 3:23-cv-05488
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 30, 2023
Terminated:Sep 11, 2024
Case in other court:Thurston County Superior Court, 23-00002-01226-34
Last checked: Sunday Nov 26, 2023 1:34 AM PST
Defendant
The International City Management Association Retirement Company
Represented By
Robert Chester Double, III
Mayer Brown Llp (ca)
contact info
Ai-Li Anna Chiong-Martinson
Mcnaul Ebel Nawrot & Helgren PLLC
contact info
Andrew J Demko
Mayer Brown Llp (ca)
contact info
Anna F Cavnar
Mcnaul Ebel Nawrot & Helgren PLLC
contact info
Xitlaly Estrada
Mayer Brown Llp (ca)
contact info
John Nadolenco
Mayer Brown Llp (ca)
contact info
Plaintiff
Sara Ann Walker
Represented By
Katherine M Brosius
Cap City Law Ps
contact info
Jessica McKeegan Jensen
Jessica Jensen Law Ps
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
ICMA-RC Services LLC
Terminated: 08/30/2023
Represented By
Robert Chester Double, III
Mayer Brown Llp (ca)
contact info
Ai-Li Anna Chiong-Martinson
Mcnaul Ebel Nawrot & Helgren PLLC
contact info
Anna F Cavnar
Mcnaul Ebel Nawrot & Helgren PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
56 56 order Judgment by Court Wed 09/11 3:09 PM
JUDGMENT BY COURT. Defendant's42 motion for summary judgment is granted. (SB)
Related: [-]
55 55 order 1 - Order Wed 09/11 3:09 PM
ORDER granting Defendant's42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (SB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
54 54 minutes Motion Hearing Thu 09/05 11:04 AM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson - Dep Clerk: D. Staples ; Pla Counsel: Jessica McKeegan Jensen ; Def Counsel: Andrew J Demko, Carter M Jansen, Anna F Cavnar ; CR: Nancy Bauer ; Time of Hearing: 10:00 AM ; Courtroom: 16106 ; Motion Hearing held on 9/5/2024 re42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The International City Management Association Retirement Company. The Court hears oral argument from counsel and takes this matter under advisement. Order to be issued. (DS)
Related: [-]