Bates v. Clarke
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Henry E Hudson |
Referred: | Mark R Colombell |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00359 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 26, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 03/26 12:21 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Petitioner's motions (ECF Nos.10 ,11 ,12 ,16 ) are DENIED; The Motion to Dismiss (ECF no.9 ) is GRANTED; Petitioners claims and the action are DISMISSED; The § 2254 Petition is DENIED; A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Judgment is entered in favor of the defendant Harold W. Clarke. Signed by Clerk on 3/26/2024. Copy mailed to Plaintiff.(jenjones, ) |
|
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 03/26 12:14 PM
ORDER (Granting Respondent's Motion to Dismiss) that: Petitioner's motions (ECF Nos.10 ,11 ,12 ,16 ) are DENIED. The Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.9 ) is GRANTED. Petitioner's claims and the action are DISMISSED. The § 2254 Petition is DENIED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter a final appealable Judgment in a Civil Case in favor of Respondent. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. Should Petitioner desire to appeal, a written notice of appeal must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within thirty (30) days of the date of entry hereof. Failure to file a notice of appeal within that period may result in the loss of the ability to appeal. It is so ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 3/26/2024. Copy of Memorandum Opinion and Order mailed to Plaintiff. (jenjones, ) |
|
18 | 18
15
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Tue 03/26 12:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 3/26/2024. (jenjones, ) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Mon 02/12 4:39 PM
Letter re: status update from Britney Bates.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, January 08, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appoint Counsel
Tue 01/09 9:23 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Britney Odell Bates.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Tue 01/09 9:22 AM
Letter by Britney Odell Bates.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Fri 08/18 3:18 PM
Letter received from Britney Bates. Clerk mailed copy of docket sheet.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope | ||
Monday, August 07, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice (other)
Tue 08/08 4:50 PM
TRAVERSE by Britney Odell Bates(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
12 | 12
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Tue 08/08 4:48 PM
MOTION Under Rule 8 Evidentiary Hearing by Britney Odell Bates.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
11 | 11
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Tue 08/08 4:47 PM
MOTION Under Rule 7 Expand the Records by Britney Odell Bates.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
10 | 10
motion
Miscellaneous Relief (MOTION)
Tue 08/08 4:45 PM
MOTION Under Rule 6 Discovery by Britney Odell Bates.(jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
misc
State Court Records Returned/Received
Tue 07/18 2:57 PM
STATE COURT RECORDS received from Virginia Court of Appeals in record#: 0573-20-4. One USB received and placed in brown exp. (adun, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/12 11:02 AM
MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. by Harold W. Clarke. (Brooker, Lindsay) |
|
8 | 8
respoth
Brief in Support
Wed 07/12 10:05 AM
Brief in Support to5 Response to Habeas Petition,6 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. filed by Harold W. Clarke.(Brooker, Lindsay) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Roseboro Notice
Wed 07/12 9:53 AM
Roseboro Notice by Harold W. Clarke (Brooker, Lindsay) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/12 9:51 AM
MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. by Harold W. Clarke. (Brooker, Lindsay) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Response to Habeas Petition
Wed 07/12 9:49 AM
Rule 5 Answer RESPONSE to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Harold W. Clarke.(Brooker, Lindsay) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
misc
State Court Records Returned/Received
Fri 06/30 4:25 PM
STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED from Stafford County Circuit Court in case number CR19000326-00. One small box of loose documents received. (placed in brown expandable) (adun, ) |
||
misc
State Court Records Returned/Received
Fri 06/30 4:36 PM
State Court Record received from Supreme Court of Virginia in record #220395. 1 Flash Drive (placed in brown expandable). (jenjones, ) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/16 8:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Brooker on behalf of Harold W. Clarke (Brooker, Lindsay) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Acknowledgment of Receipt
Thu 06/15 12:41 PM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF Receipt as to2 Order of Prisoner Service (2254), filed by Harold W. Clarke. (Brooker, Lindsay) |
|
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
2
pgs
order
Order Prisoner Service (2254)
Tue 06/13 12:44 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER (Serving 28 U.S.C. §2254 Petition) - It is ORDERED that: The petition is FILED; Respondent shall file a responsive pleading within thirty (30) days of the receipt of this Memorandum Order; The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve Respondent. Service shall be made by electronically transmitting a copy of this Memorandum Order and the petition to the Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Virginia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark R. Colombell on 6/13/2023. (jenjones, ) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254)
Wed 05/31 12:12 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 300001435.) filed by Britney Odell Bates. Clerk mailed extra copy back to petitioner as requested. (jenjones, ) |
|
Att: 1 Receipt, | ||
Att: 2 Cover letter, | ||
Att: 3 Envelope |