Delaware District Court
Judge:Sue L Robinson
Case #: 1:14-cv-01317
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 17, 2014
Terminated:Jan 05, 2017
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 6:23 AM EDT
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Represented By
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Matthew Alan Pearson
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Steven J. Balick
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Defendant
Aventisub LLC
Represented By
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Matthew Alan Pearson
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Steven J. Balick
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Defendant
Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Steven D. Maslowski
contact info
Dianne B. Elderkin
contact info
Matthew Alan Pearson
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Matthew G Hartman
contact info
Steven J. Balick
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Angela Verrecchio
contact info
Defendant
Sanofi
Represented By
Andrew Colin Mayo
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Matthew Alan Pearson
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Siew Yen Chong
contact info
John J. Molenda
contact info
Steven J. Balick
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Vishal C. Gupta
contact info
Jeffrey C. Lee
contact info
Tiffany Geyer Lydon
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Plaintiff
Amgen Inc.
Represented By
Melanie K. Sharp
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
William G. Gaede, III
contact info
James L. Higgins
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info


1. Judge Rules Against Sanofi and Regeneron in Patent Case (wsj.com)
Submitted Fri 01/06/2017
Docket last updated: 01/20/2017 11:59 PM EST
Thursday, January 12, 2017
404 404 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing ROA - Federal Circuit Fri 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA for the Federal Circuit re402 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc., Aventisub LLC, Sanofi, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. USCA Case Number 17-1480 (fms)
Related: [-]
403 403 notice Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel Thu 1:06 PM
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP, Dianne B. Elderkin, Steven D. Maslowski, Michael P. Kahn, Matthew A. Pearson, Angela Verrecchio, Jenna M. Pellecchia, Matthew G. Hartman, Michael N. Petegorsky, and Jonathan J. Underwood as co-counsel.. (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
402 402 appeal - NOTICE OF APPEAL - Federal Circuit Thu 12:55 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Federal Circuit of392 Memorandum and Order,391 Judgment, . Appeal filed by Aventisub LLC, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sanofi, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
appeal - APPEAL - Credit Card Payment (Attorneys Only) Thu 1:11 PM
APPEAL - Credit Card Payment of $505.00 received re402 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) filed by Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc., Aventisub LLC, Sanofi, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. ( Filing fee $505, receipt number 0311-2063770.) (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Notice of Appeal and Docket Transmitted Thu 2:04 PM
Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re402 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit). (nmg)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Appeal Record Sent to Reporter Gunning Thu 2:05 PM
Notification regarding402 Notice of Appeal (Federal Circuit) sent to Reporter Gunning (nmg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 09, 2017
401 401 order Order - -Memorandum and Order Mon 9:29 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER denying394 MOTION to Stay Issuance of Permanent Injunction Pending Appeal . The permanent injunction is stayed for 45 days. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/9/2017. (nmfn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
400 400 misc Letter Fri 2:15 PM
[SEALED] Email Request for Emergency Relief and Opposing Counsel's Response to E-Mail Request for Emergency Relief. (nmfn)
Related: [-]
399 399 misc Declaration Fri 2:14 AM
[SEALED] DECLARATION re395 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Sharon M. Oster), by Aventisub LLC, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sanofi, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
398 398 misc Declaration Fri 2:12 AM
[SEALED] DECLARATION re395 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Robert Terifay), by Aventisub LLC, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sanofi, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
397 397 misc Declaration Fri 2:10 AM
[SEALED] DECLARATION re395 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Victoria Carey), by Aventisub LLC, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sanofi, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
396 396 misc Declaration Fri 2:09 AM
[SEALED] DECLARATION re395 Opening Brief in Support, (Declaration of Robert H. Eckel, M.D.) by Aventisub LLC, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sanofi, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
395 395 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Fri 2:06 AM
[SEALED] OPENING BRIEF in Support re394 MOTION to Stay Issuance of Permanent Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Aventisub LLC, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sanofi, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/20/2017. (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
394 394 motion Stay Fri 2:02 AM
MOTION to Stay Issuance of Permanent Injunction Pending Appeal - filed by Aventisub LLC, Regeneron Pharmaceuticals Inc., Sanofi, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Balick, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2017
393 393 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Thu 4:45 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,563,698; 8,829,165; 8,859,741.(nmfn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Judgment
392 392 order Order - -Memorandum and Order Thu 4:34 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER granting336 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Amgen Inc., Amgen Manufacturing Limited, Amgen USA Inc. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/5/2017. (nmfn)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Civil Thu 4:38 PM
CASE CLOSED per D.I.389 ,390 ,391 , and392 . (nmfn)
Related: [-]