Moxley et al v. R&B Corporation of Virginia DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE. FILE IN CASE #4:23cv66
Virginia Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jamar K Walker |
Referred: | Robert J Krask |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-00070 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle |
Case Filed: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 29, 2023 9:45 AM EST |
Defendant
R&B Corporation of Virginia
|
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Moxley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wendi Moyer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
11
pgs
order
Order
Thu 07/20 11:01 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER: It is ORDERED that the following cases are consolidated for all purposes: 4:23-cv-66; 4:23-cv-67; 4:23-cv-68; 4:23-cv-69; 4:23-cv-70; 4:23-cv-71; and 4:23-cv-76. All filings shall be made in the lead case, 4:23-cv-66. The Clerk is DIRECTED to amend the case name of lead case 4:23-cv-66 on CM/ECF to: In re R&B Corporation of Virginia d/b/a Credit Control Corporation, Data Security Breach Litigation. It is ORDERED that Bryan L. Bleichner of Chestnut Cambronne PA, Benjamin F. Johns of Shub & Johns LLC, and Gary M. Klinger of Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman LLC are hereby APPOINTED as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel and David Hilton Wise of the Wise Law Firm PLC is hereby APPOINTED as Liaison Counsel. The plaintiffs are ORDERED to file an amended, consolidated complaint within 30 days of the entry of this Memorandum Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any action subsequently filed in, transferred to, or removed to this Court that arises out of similar facts as the above-captioned cases may be consolidated by the Court based on notice of such filing by plaintiffs' counsel or defendants counsel and the passage of ten (10) days, or on the Court's own motion and notice. If any party objects to such consolidation or otherwise wishes to seek alternative relief, they must do so before the expiration of the 10-day period. See Order for additional details. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 7/20/2023. (afar) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation
Thu 07/20 11:48 AM
All Future Docket Entries Will Be Made In the Lead Case, 4:23cv66. (afar) |
||
Monday, July 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/17 6:21 PM
STIPULATION re7 Order,,6 Stipulation, Consolidate Cases and to appoint Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Class Counsel by Stephanie Moxley, Wendi Moyer.(Wise, David) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order
Fri 07/07 12:00 PM
ORDER. All counsel of record for the plaintiffs in cases 4:23-cv-66, 4:23-cv-67, 4:23-cv-68, 4:23-cv-69, 4:23-cv-70, and 4:23-cv-71 are ORDERED to consult with counsel for the plaintiff in 4:23-cv-76 regarding the appointment of class counsel and consolidation of all seven cases. Counsel for the plaintiffs are further ORDERED to file amended motions, supplemental briefs, or other filings as are necessary to include the seventh-filed case (4:23-cv-76) in the relief sought in the motions. Signed by District Judge Jamar K. Walker on 7/6/23. (jhie, ) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 07/06 11:08 AM
Case Reassigned to District Judge Jamar K. Walker. District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith no longer assigned to the case. (afar) |
||
Saturday, July 01, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Sat 07/01 4:24 PM
STIPULATION MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:23-cv-66; 4:23-cv-67; 4:23-cv-68; 4:23-cv-69; 4:23-cv-70; 4:23-cv-71 by Stephanie Moxley, Wendi Moyer.(Wise, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Consolidate Cases, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 06/21 2:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Thomas J. Bayne on 06/13/2023, filed by Stephanie Moxley, Wendi Moyer. (Hirsh, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Fri 06/02 9:17 AM
Summons Issued as to R&B Corporation of Virginia, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Please remove the headers and print two duplexed copies of the electronically issued summons for each Defendant. Please serve one copy of the summons and a copy of the Complaint upon each Defendant. Please ensure that your process server returns the service copy (executed or unexecuted) to your attention and electronically file it using the filing events, Summons Returned Executed or Summons Returned Unexecuted.(epri, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Motions Procedures | ||
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Citizenship Disclosure Form
Thu 06/01 4:55 PM
Citizenship Disclosure Form (Local Rule 7.1) by Stephanie Moxley, Wendi Moyer. (Hirsh, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Thu 06/01 4:53 PM
Proposed Summons by Stephanie Moxley, Wendi Moyer. (Hirsh, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
40
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/01 4:23 PM
Complaint , Class Action ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-8963263.), filed by Stephanie Moxley, Wendi Moyer.(Hirsh, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Initial Case Assignment
Fri 06/02 9:09 AM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rebecca Beach Smith and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, ) |