Corey Kupersmith
Connecticut Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Alan Hw Shiff |
Case #: | 5:12-bk-52303 |
Case Filed: | Dec 29, 2012 |
Creditor Meeting: | Feb 05, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Mar 18, 2015 |
Converted: | Nov 19, 2014 |
Discharged: | Feb 18, 2015 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Feb 17, 2015 |
Type | Individual |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Corey Kupersmith
41 Byram Terrace Dr
Greenwich, CT 06831-5124 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Ronald I. Chorches
Law Offices of Ronald I. Chorches LLC 449 Silas Deane Highway 2nd Floor
Wethersfield, CT 06109 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Giaimo Federal Building 150 Court Street, Room 302
New Haven, CT 06510 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/25/2015 7:07 PM EDT |
Saturday, December 29, 2012 | ||
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 12-52303 [misc,volp11] (1213.00) filing fee - $1213.00. Receipt number 5263883. (U.S. Treasury) | ||
1 | 1 11 pgs Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Matrix due at time of filing. Chapter 11 Means Test Form, Schedule A-J, Statement of Financial Affairs, Statistical Summary of Schedules, Summary of Schedules, 2016(b) Statement due by 01/14/2013. Filed by Corey Kupersmith. (Plotkin, Ellery) Modified on 1/2/2013 to reflect matrix not uploaded, 2016(b) Statement missing.(Waterbury, Susan). | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Ellery E. Plotkin on behalf of Corey Kupersmith Debtor, . (Plotkin, Ellery) | |
4 | 4 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Ellery E. Plotkin on behalf of Corey Kupersmith Debtor, . (Plotkin, Ellery) |