Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Margaret R Guzman
Referred: David H Hennessy
Case #: 4:23-cv-40069
Nature of Suit751 Labor - Family and Medical Leave Act
CauseFamily and Medical Leave Act of 1993
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2023 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
Town of Westminster
Represented By
Courtney E. Mayo
Hassett & Donnelly, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Chief Ralph LeBlanc
Represented By
Jeffrey J. Trapani
Pierce, Davis & Perritano, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Nelson
Represented By
Jordan E. Burke
Law Offices Of Timothy M. Burke
contact info
Timothy M. Burke
Law Offices Of Timothy M. Burke
contact info
Jared S. Burke
Law Offices Of Timothy M. Burke
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
Judge David Hennessy
Terminated: 12/08/2023


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
49 49 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/13 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Simms on behalf of Chief Ralph LeBlanc (Simms, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
48 48 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/08 10:17 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Sroczynski on behalf of Chief Ralph LeBlanc (Sroczynski, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
47 47 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/12 1:31 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ORDER entered. AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
46 46 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 12/12 1:28 PM
Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: Scheduling Conference held on 12/12/2024. Case called. Counsel appear by video for scheduling conference. Court adopts proposed scheduling order with changes; amended order to issue. Fact Discovery to be completed by 9/2/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 2/2/2026. Status Conference set for 9/8/2025 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester Related [+] before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman. (Court Reporter: Marianne Kusa Ryll at justicehill@aol.com) (Attorneys present: Burke, Mayo, Trapani) (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-] mote only
Thursday, December 05, 2024
45 45 misc Joint statement of counsel Thu 12/05 3:41 PM
Proposed JOINT STATEMENT of counsel regarding Scheduling Order . (Burke, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
44 44 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 11/20 9:43 AM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2024 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 2 - Worcester Related [+] before District Judge Margaret R. Guzman. This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the courtroom deputy of the session as soon as possible. Audio access to the hearing may be available to the media and public. Please check the [LINK:Court schedule] . In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html] . For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the general orders and public notices of the Court available on [LINK:www.mad.uscourts.gov] or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov . (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-] mote only
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
43 43 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 10/01 9:03 PM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by Town of Westminster.(Mayo, Courtney)
Related: [-]
42 42 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 10/01 3:29 PM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by Chief Ralph LeBlanc.(Trapani, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
41 41 order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 09/17 4:25 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered adopting Report and Recommendations re29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting Report and Recommendations re31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Order On Report and Recommendations Tue 09/17 4:04 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered adopting38 Report and Recommendation. (Frisch, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
39 39 utility Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 08/30 4:32 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Report and Recommendations Fri 08/30 4:31 PM
Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Town of Westminster,29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Chief Ralph LeBlanc Recommendation: As to Counts I and III for discrimination/retaliation in violation of the FMLA, Defendants' motions to dismiss should be DENIED. As to Count II for interference with FMLA-protected rights, LeBlanc's motion to dismiss should be GRANTED. As to Count IV for violations of the Massachusetts Civil Rights Act, LeBlanc's motion to dismiss should be GRANTED. As to Count V for intentional interference with an advantageous relationship, LeBlanc's motion to dismiss should be DENIED. As to Count VI for negligent supervision, Westminster's motion to dismiss should be GRANTED. As to Count VII for gender and sex discrimination in violation of Massachusetts law, Westminster's motion to dismiss should be DENIED. As to Count IX for retaliation in violation of Title VII of the Civil Rights Act, Westminster's motion to dismiss should be DENIED. As to Count X for sexual harassment in violation of Title VII of the Civil Rights Act, Westminster's motion to dismiss should be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 9/13/2024.(King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
37 37 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 05/03 9:04 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. Referred for: Report and Recommendations (rr). Motions referred:31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) . Further information: R&R.(Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
36 36 19 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/08 2:35 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Amy Nelson. (Burke, Timothy)
Related: [-]
35 35 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/08 2:34 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Amy Nelson. (Burke, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/07 10:04 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) and31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 3/8/2024. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/06 11:04 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 03/08/2024 to File Response/Reply as to31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ,29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Amy Nelson.(Burke, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
32 32 14 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 01/12 5:03 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re31 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Town of Westminster. (Mayo, Courtney)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/12 5:02 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Town of Westminster.(Mayo, Courtney)
Related: [-]
30 30 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 01/12 4:42 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re29 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Chief Ralph LeBlanc. (Trapani, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/12 4:40 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Chief Ralph LeBlanc.(Trapani, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Stipulation Fri 01/12 9:28 AM
STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal with Prejudice by Amy Nelson. (Burke, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 01/09 10:12 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting26 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
26 26 motion File Excess Pages Mon 01/08 3:25 PM
Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12)(b)(6) by Chief Ralph LeBlanc.(Trapani, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/12 3:58 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Chief Ralph LeBlanc answer due 1/12/2024; Town of Westminster answer due 1/12/2024. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
24 24 motion Extension of Time Mon 12/11 9:20 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to January 12, 2024 to File An Answer or Responsive Pleading by Chief Ralph LeBlanc.(Trapani, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
23 23 adr Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider Fri 12/08 12:30 PM
REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider.(King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
21 21 minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 12/06 2:43 PM
*NOT RECORDED* Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Telephone Conference held on 12/6/2023. Court and parties discuss matters prior to tomorrow's scheduled mediation. (Court Reporter: None.)(Attorneys present: Burke, T.; Mayo, Trapani) (King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of ADR Conference Tue 10/24 11:54 AM
NOTICE of ADR Conference, Order and Telephone Conference. *See attached order*. IN-PERSON Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for 12/7/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. Pre-Mediation Telephone Conferences set for 12/6/2023 as follows: 11:30 AM for Plaintiff; 12:00 PM for Defendants. Call-in information will be emailed to counsel.(King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 10/23 9:00 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Chief Ralph LeBlanc answer due 12/22/2023; Town of Westminster answer due 12/22/2023. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
19 19 minutes Telephone Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 10/24 11:43 AM
*NOT RECORDED* Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Telephone Conference held on 10/20/2023. Parties discuss proceeding with a mediation in person or via video. Parties to pick a date. (Court Reporter: None.)(Attorneys present: Burke, T.; Mayo; Tripani) (King, Dawn)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 10/20 2:29 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to December 22, 2023 to File Response/Reply as to12 Amended Complaint -SECOND JOINT MOTION by Chief Ralph LeBlanc.(Trapani, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
16 16 notice Notice of ADR Conference Mon 10/02 2:22 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of pre-ADR Phone Conference set for 10/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1 Worcester Related [+] before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. Please be prepared to discuss the parties' position on participating in an in-person or video conference mediation as well as agreed upon dates to present to the Court in order to schedule the mediation. *Call-in phone number will be emailed to counsel separately. (King, Dawn)
Related: [-] mote only
15 15 order Order Referring Case to ADR Mon 10/02 9:07 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. Case is referred to Magistrate Judge Hennessy for Mediation.(Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 08/28 12:22 PM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Chief Ralph LeBlanc answer due 11/6/2023; Town of Westminster answer due 11/6/2023. (Castles, Martin)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 08/25 4:01 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re12 Amended Complaint by Chief Ralph LeBlanc, Town of Westminster.(Trapani, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 23, 2023
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 08/23 3:43 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Amy Nelson.(Burke, Timothy)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion to Amend Wed 08/23 11:35 AM
District Judge Margaret R. Guzman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting9 Motion to Amend Complaint. (Belpedio, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/22 2:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney E. Mayo on behalf of Town of Westminster (Mayo, Courtney)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Amend Tue 08/22 11:11 AM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint, by Amy Nelson.(Burke, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/25 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Trapani on behalf of Chief Ralph LeBlanc (Trapani, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
7 7 service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 07/07 11:18 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Amy Nelson. Town of Westminster served on 7/7/2023, answer due 7/28/2023. Acknowledgment filed by Amy Nelson. (Burke, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/06 4:32 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Amy Nelson. Chief Ralph LeBlanc waiver sent on 7/6/2023, answer due 9/5/2023. (Burke, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 06/15 12:07 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Barrows, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Assignment Thu 06/15 12:05 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Margaret R. Guzman assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (Barrows, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/14 12:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan E. Burke on behalf of Amy Nelson (Burke, Jordan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 06/14 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jared S. Burke on behalf of Amy Nelson (Burke, Jared)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/14 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9904614 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Amy Nelson.(Burke, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Category Form Category Form