Winningham v. Wells Fargo, Inc. et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 4:14-cv-00853 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 21, 2014 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2014 |
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 2:55 AM CDT |
Defendant
Veronica Ayarza
|
|
Defendant
Britney
|
|
Defendant
Jane Doe
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Dick Kovacevich
|
|
Defendant
Nancy
|
|
Defendant
Jeff Nickerson
|
|
Defendant
James M Strother
|
|
Defendant
Stanley Stroup
|
|
Defendant
John G. Stumpf
|
|
Defendant
Wells Fargo, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Winningham
6340 Lake Worth Blvd Suite 437
Fort Worth, TX 76135 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, September 14, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/18 12:18 PM
Demand to Re-Open Case filed by Glenn Winningham (saw) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned (Public Entry)
Mon 09/18 12:17 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Reed C. O'Connor. Judge John McBryde no longer assigned to the case. (saw) |
||
Tuesday, February 23, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 02/23 3:17 PM
Notice and Demand filed by Glenn Winningham. (pef) |
|
Wednesday, November 19, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 FINAL JUDGMENT: In accordance with the order issued this same day and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58, all of Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED for lack of prosecution, without prejudice to their being refiled. See Fed R. Civ. P. 41(b). All costs of court are taxed against the party who incurred them. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/19/2014) (mdf) | |
9 | 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: In the October 22 order, the Court informed Winningham that failure to timely pay the filing and administrative fees or properly file a completed IFP application could result in the dismissal of his complaint without further notice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). In the time since, Winningham has not paid the fees or filed any proper motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Therefore, The document and all papers filed as docket 6 are all STRICKEN from the record of this case, and the clerk of Court is directed to note on the docket that this document has been unfiled. Further, Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED for lack of prosecution, without prejudice to their being refiled. See Fed R. Civ. P. 41(b). (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 11/19/2014) (mdf) | |
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:9,10. Wed Nov 19 16:38:24 CST 2014 (crt) | ||
Monday, November 17, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Britney, Dick Kovacevich, Jeff Nickerson, James M Strother, Stanley Stroup, John G. Stumpf, Wells Fargo, Inc., Veronica Ayarza, John Doe, Jane Doe, Nancy filed by Glenn Winningham. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mdf) | |
7 | 7 Demand for Recusal filed by Glenn Winningham. (mdf) | |
Wednesday, October 29, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 ***UNFILED PER9 ORDER*** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Glenn Winningham. (mdf) Modified on 11/19/2014 (mdf). | |
Wednesday, October 22, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 Order and Notice of Deficiency: Glenn Winningham must address the following deficiency: Plaintiff has not paid the filing and administrative fees nor has he filed a long-form application to proceed in forma pauperis. Failure to comply with this order may lead to dismissal for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCvP 41(b). Deadline to cure the deficiency is 14 days. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 10/22/2014) (mdf) | |
Att: 1 IFP Form | ||
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5. Wed Oct 22 13:49:29 CDT 2014 (crt) | ||
Tuesday, October 21, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 Standing ORDER Concerning Paper Filing in Cases Assigned to District Judge John McBryde...see order for specifics. (Ordered by Judge John McBryde on 10/21/2014) (mdf) | |
3 | 3 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mdf) | |
2 | 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to staff attorney DK. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mdf) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Britney, Dick Kovacevich, Jeff Nickerson, James M Strother, Stanley Stroup, John G. Stumpf, Wells Fargo, Inc. filed by Glenn Winningham. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mdf) | |
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:2,3,4. Tue Oct 21 16:39:32 CDT 2014 (crt) |