Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:Chelsey M Vascura
Referred: Chelsey M Vascura
Case #: 2:23-cv-02113
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2023
Terminated:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 30, 2023 5:13 AM EST
Defendant
Daily Services, LLC
Represented By
Shannon K Patton
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Robert W. Pritchard
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Alexander R. Frondorf
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Judson Severn Millhon, III
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Surge Staffing, LLC
Represented By
Shannon K Patton
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Robert W. Pritchard
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Alexander R. Frondorf
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Judson Severn Millhon, III
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Bunger
Represented By
Tristan Thomas Akers
Coffman Legal, LLC
contact info
Kelsie N. Hendren
Kauffman Legal, LLC
contact info
Adam C. Gedling
Coffman Legal, LLC
contact info
Matthew J.P. Coffman
Coffman Legal, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathanial Green
Represented By
Tristan Thomas Akers
Coffman Legal, LLC
contact info
Kelsie N. Hendren
Kauffman Legal, LLC
contact info
Adam C. Gedling
Coffman Legal, LLC
contact info
Matthew J.P. Coffman
Coffman Legal, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Rebecca Green
Terminated: 11/30/2023
Represented By
Tristan Thomas Akers
Coffman Legal, LLC
contact info
Kelsie N Hendren
Coffman Legal, LLC
contact info
Adam C. Gedling
Coffman Legal, LLC
contact info
Matthew J.P. Coffman
Coffman Legal, LLC
contact info

GPO Jun 06 2024
OPINION and ORDER granting 30 Ms. Bunger's Motion for Court-Appointed Notice is GRANTED and her distribution plan is APPROVED. However, her proposed Notice and Consent to Join are NOT APPROVED. Ms. Bunger is ORDERED to file a motion to approve a revised proposed Notice and Consent to Join form, within seven days. Signed by Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 6/6/24. (sem)

Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
83 83 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 04/28 5:58 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiffs Jennifer Bunger, Nathanial Green. (Coffman, Matthew)
Related: [-]
82 82 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/28 2:57 PM
ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Chelsey M. Vascura. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Signed by Chief District Judge Sarah D. Morrison on 4/28/2025. (merc)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 04/29 11:07 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (er)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
81 81 notice Notice (Other) Fri 04/25 9:27 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Surge Staffing, LLC Consent to Magistrate Judge (Frondorf, Alexander)
Related: [-]